Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
STATE OF FLORIDA vs. LOMELINO, ERICA RUNAE
A case was filed against Lomelino, Erica Runae, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL. Judge COLLINS, TIMOTHY R. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 13, 2021
Last Refreshed
August 26, 2023
Filing Location
Clay County, FL
Practice Area
Criminal
Matter Type
Criminal Related (Civil)
Status
Closed
Parties
Defendants
Case Documents
PAYMENT 158.00 RECEIPT 108961
Date: Oct 01, 2021DISPOSITION
Date: Sep 16, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENSE OR ADMISSION AND WAIVER OF APPEARANCE
Date: Sep 14, 2021PAYMENT 7.00 RECEIPT 106517
Date: Sep 14, 2021CITATION FILED
Date: Sep 13, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - A1OZTDE | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $158.00 RECEIPT #108961 | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - A1OZTDE | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - A1OZTDE | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENSE OR ADMISSION AND WAIVER OF APPEARANCE | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $7.00 RECEIPT #106517 | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | ADD SENT TO TCATS - A1OZTDE | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 09/13/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021TR017126 |