Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
STATE OF FLORIDA vs. WIGGS, AMELIA
A case was filed against Wiggs, Amelia Cressie, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL. Judge MOBLEY, KRISTINA K. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 01, 2021
Last Refreshed
October 04, 2023
Filing Location
Clay County, FL
Practice Area
Criminal
Matter Type
Criminal Related (Civil)
Status
Active
Parties
Defendants
Case Documents
D6 CLEARED
Date: Mar 23, 2022PAYMENT 285.00 RECEIPT 131698
Date: Mar 23, 202260 DAY PAYMENT PLAN LETTER
Date: Feb 18, 2022PAYMENT 25.00 RECEIPT 115630
Date: Nov 18, 2021CITATION FILED
Date: Sep 01, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | D6 CLEARED | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $285.00 RECEIPT #131698 | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AE47SOE | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AE47SOE | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | D6 ISSUED 03/18/2022 / LICENSE SUSPENDED - PF - $285.00 | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | D-6 SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | 60 DAY PAYMENT PLAN LETTER | |
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $25.00 RECEIPT #115630 | |
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT PLAN AGREEMENT | |
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT INFORMATION FORM | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 09/01/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021TR016679 | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ADD SENT TO TCATS - AE47SOE |