Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
NEUROTECH FAMILY & PHYSICAL MEDICINE A/A/O JAMICHAEL A MCGAHEE vs. ESURANCE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
On September 30, 2021 a small claims $0-$99 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL. Judge FORBESS, RAYMOND EDWARD Jr presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 30, 2021
Last Refreshed
October 06, 2023
Filing Location
Clay County, FL
Category
Small Claims $0-$99
Practice Area
Small Claims
Matter Type
General Small Claims
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: Jun 16, 2023NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: Oct 28, 2022REPLY TO DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: May 09, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: Nov 10, 2021SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR MEDIATION
Date: Sep 30, 2021SMALL CLAIMS CHECKLIST
Date: Sep 30, 2021SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: Sep 30, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: Sep 30, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 6/21/2023 10:37 AM / RECEPTION #: 2023030244 | |
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF THE CMS WEBSITE | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF REIMBURSEMENTS | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF THE MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES PRESS RELEASE | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF THE FEDERAL REGISTER | |
December 17, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM INFORMATION | |
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ANSWERING INTERROGATORIES | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ANSWERING INTERROGATORIES | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ANSWERING INTERROGATORIES | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ANSWERING INTERROGATORIES | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO AUTHENTICATE PAYOUT LOG | |
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES | |
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO PERMIT ADDITIONAL REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY TO ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER INVOKING FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
November 27, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
November 27, 2021 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS | |
November 27, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ORDER SETTING WITHOUT PREJUDICE CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE FOR A JURY TRIAL IN GENERAL CASE | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SUMMONS RETURNED - CFO SRVD VIA ELECTRONIC DELIVERY 10/19/2021 | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR MEDIATION | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS CHECKLIST | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 09/30/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021SC002735 | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #108757 |