Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
The State of Florida vs. Weeks, Brian Allen
A case was filed against Weeks, Brian Allen, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL. Judge COLLINS, TIMOTHY R. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 20, 2014
Last Refreshed
January 10, 2022
Filing Location
Clay County, FL
Practice Area
Criminal
Matter Type
Criminal Related (Civil)
Status
Closed
Parties
Defendants
Case Documents
D6 Cleared
Date: Oct 01, 2014Citation
Date: May 20, 2014Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event | D6 Cleared | |
August 14, 2014 | Docket Event | D6 Executed by Aging - Fail to Pay | |
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Citation |