Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
STATE OF FLORIDA vs. SWITLYK, STEPHEN ROBERT
A case was filed against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL. Judge BURNS, JOHN L presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 01, 2020
Last Refreshed
October 06, 2023
Filing Location
Charlotte County, FL
Practice Area
Criminal
Matter Type
Criminal Related (Civil)
Status
Active
Parties
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: Dec 15, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: Dec 02, 2020NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: Dec 02, 2020CITATION (TICKET)
Date: Dec 01, 2020Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | TRAFFIC ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 01/11/2021 AT 10:00 AM IN VIA ZOOM CONFERENCE/ , JDG: Burns, John L | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | TRAFFIC ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 01/05/2021 AT 10:00 AM IN VIA ZOOM CONFERENCE/ , JDG: Burns, John L | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGE BURNS, JOHN L: ASSIGNED | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENSE ATTORNEY: HAENEL, DAVID ASSIGNED | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | CITATION (TICKET) | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 12/01/2020 CASE NUMBER 20008286TR | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE UPDATED : WAITING FOR PAYMENT REQUIRED BY: 12/25/2020 | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | SEQ: 1 - (316.187 2A) SPEEDING 70 INTERSTATE - REQUIRES SPEEDS | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - ACST74E | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | SPEEDING VIOLATIONS ASSESSED $278.00 DUE ON 12/31/2020 | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : WAITING FOR PAYMENT REQUIRED BY: 12/25/2020 |