Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In Re: Estate of: Stewart, Patricia
On December 29, 2021 a 3 case was filed by Brunson, Sebrina, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Lopane, Nicholas presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 29, 2021
Last Refreshed
November 15, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Category
3
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
General Probate
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction & Release Claim Of Florida Power and Light Company, c/o Probate Recovery Systems, LLC |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Death Certificate - Follow Up Filing - Original | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Claim Mailed By Clerk AscensionPoint Recovery Services, LLC on behalf of Synchrony Bank - Mailed by clerk 03/16/22 jtAmount: $1,967.80 |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Claim Mailed By Clerk AscensionPoint Recovery Services, LLC on behalf of Synchrony Bank - not yet processed by clerkAmount: $1,967.80 |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Claim Mailed By Clerk CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A - Mailed by clerk 04/11/22 jtAmount: $3,438.64 |
|
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibits Funeral Bill |
|
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibits Affidavit Corncerning Criminal History |
|
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibits Petition To Determine Homestead Real Property |
|
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibits Waiver Of Formal Notice |
|
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibits Affidavit Of Heirs |
|
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibits Copy Of Death Certificate |
|
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Paid Funeral Bill | |
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Determine Homestead Non-SRS Signed 2/21/22 Judge Levenson |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Summary Administration Less Than $ 1000 Filing Fee | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Waiver & Consent | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Death Certificate exxpired 8/19/21Party: Decedent Stewart, Patricia |
|
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Regarding Criminal History Party: Petitioner Brunson, Sebrina |
|
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Heirs Party: Petitioner Brunson, Sebrina |
|
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition to Determine Homestead Real Property | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Summary Administration Intestate |