Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
B3 Medical Plaintiff vs. Geico Indemnity Company Defendant
On October 31, 2019 a * pip claims > $5,000 - $15,000 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge DePrimo, Natasha presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 31, 2019
Last Refreshed
September 12, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Category
* PIP Claims > $5,000 - $15,000
Status
Closed
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I:_ BREACH OF CONTRACT
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by B3 Medical on behalf of Charquenetta E Dorris against Geico Indemnity Company. The complaint alleges a breach of contract by Geico Indemnity Company. The amount in dispute is between $5,000 and $15,000, exclusive of int…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Jan 10, 2020Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Oct 31, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Geico Indemnity Company |
|
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer & Affirmative Defenses | |
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: JOHN DALY ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A195659; ;Amount: $300.00 |
|
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: JOHN DALY ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A195659; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event | eSummons Issuance | |
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint (eFiled) |