Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Toquon Services Plaintiff vs. Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company Defendant
On January 05, 2018 a cc property insurance claims >$5k < $15k case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Feld, Ellen presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 05, 2018
Last Refreshed
October 06, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Category
CC Property Insurance Claims >$5k < $15k
Practice Area
Insurance
Matter Type
Insurance Coverage
Status
Settlement
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by TOQUON SERVICES d/b/a WET OUT RESTORATION on behalf of Helen O'Brien against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. The plaintiff alleges breach of contract as the assignee of Helen O'Brien. The plaintiff clai…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Notice of Settlement
Date: Aug 27, 2018Motion for Sanctions
Date: Aug 02, 2018Motion for Sanctions
Date: Aug 02, 2018Mediation Report
Date: Jul 30, 2018Order Setting
Date: Jul 27, 2018Mediation Report
Date: Jul 11, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: Jul 09, 2018Notice Setting Mediation
Date: Jul 09, 2018Order Referring Case to Mediation
Date: Jul 06, 2018Agreed Order
Date: Jun 22, 2018Order Referring Case to Mediation
Date: Jun 20, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: Jun 07, 2018Agreed Order
Date: May 02, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: Apr 26, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: Apr 24, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: Apr 24, 2018Motion for Sanctions
Date: Apr 24, 2018Motion for Sanctions
Date: Apr 24, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Mar 16, 2018Agreed Order
Date: Mar 06, 2018Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses
Date: Feb 21, 2018Answer to Affirmative Defenses
Date: Feb 12, 2018Stipulation Order
Date: Feb 09, 2018Request for Production
Date: Jan 05, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 05, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Toquon Services |
|
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Sanctions for defendant's failure to comply with this court's orderParty: Plaintiff Toquon Services |
|
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Sanctions for defendant's failure to comply with this court's order dated june 22, 2018Party: Plaintiff Toquon Services |
|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting pre-trial deadlines and releated requirements |
|
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate of authority pursuant to rule 1.720Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Setting Mediation FRIDAY -- .JULY 27,2018.......... 2:00 P. M |
|
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Referring Case to Mediation | |
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL BETTER RESPONSES |
|
June 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Referring Case to Mediation | |
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Readiness for Trial | |
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES |
|
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel BETTER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REOUEST FOR PRODUCTION AND BETTER, VERIFIED ltESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF' INTERROGATORIES AND MOTIONFORATTORNEY'S FEES AND, ,COSTS PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDUE 1.380Party: Plaintiff Toquon Services |
|
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions | |
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Sanctions for defendant's failure to comply with this court's order dated april 2, 2018Party: Plaintiff Toquon Services |
|
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Sanctions FOR DEFENDANT'S FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS COURT'S ORDER DATED APRIL 2, 2018Party: Plaintiff Toquon Services |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PENDING DISCOVERY |
|
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME |
|
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.140(b) & (f)Party: Plaintiff Toquon Services |
|
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order for sub of counsel for Deft |
|
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses | |
January 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service on Insurance Comm-Returned Served | |
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses AMENDEDParty: Plaintiff Toquon Services |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | eSummons Issuance | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: ERIK D. DIENER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A002367; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint (eFiled) | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: ERIK D. DIENER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A002367; ;Amount: $300.00 |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet |