Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company Plaintiff vs. Faye E Mckenzie Defendant
On January 02, 2018 a cc property insurance claims >$5k < $15k case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Feld, Ellen presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 02, 2018
Last Refreshed
October 06, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Category
CC Property Insurance Claims >$5k < $15k
Practice Area
Insurance
Matter Type
Insurance Coverage
Status
Judgment on the Pleadings
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I - NEGLIGENCE
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company, acting as the subrogee for Shirley Adams, against Faye E. McKenzie. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of McKenzie in operating her vehicle, which resulted in a collisi…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Order Granting
Date: Jul 06, 2018Affidavit of Damages
Date: Jun 08, 2018Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: Jun 08, 2018Motion for Judgment on Pleadings
Date: May 24, 2018Letter/Answer
Date: Apr 10, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 02, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Granting PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS |
|
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Affidavit | |
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Costs & Interest | |
June 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Damages Party: Plaintiff IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company |
|
June 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Affidavit OF DAMAGESParty: Plaintiff IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company |
|
June 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing June 28, 2018 @ 10:00 AM - Plaintiff's Motion For Judgment On PleadingsParty: Plaintiff IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company |
|
May 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Judgment on Pleadings WITH MEMORANDUM OF LAWParty: Plaintiff IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company |
|
April 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter/Answer PRO - SE (X)Party: Defendant Mckenzie, Faye E |
|
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons Returned Served | |
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Comment: Response/called in from Central by Derrick |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: STEVEN J JACOBSON ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A000479; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: STEVEN J JACOBSON ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A000479; ;Amount: $300.00 |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | eSummons Issuance | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint (eFiled) |