Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
GREGORY TONY, as Sheriff of Broward County Plaintiff vs. GREGORY TONY, as Sheriff of Broward County Defendant
On May 12, 2021 an other case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 12, 2021
Last Refreshed
September 16, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a petition filed by Gregory Tony, the Sheriff of Broward County, Florida, requesting the destruction of controlled substances that have been declared contraband under Florida law. The petition states that all substances controll…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Certificate
Date: Jul 19, 2021Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO
Date: May 14, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: May 12, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: May 12, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE AND RETURN OF DESTRUCTION OF CONTRABAND EURSUANT TO F.S. 893.12 (1} (A | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint (eFiled) | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Per AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined General |