Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Edmundo Madriz, et al Plaintiff vs. First Protective Insurance Company Defendant
On December 02, 2019 contract and indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Perlman, Sandra presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 02, 2019
Last Refreshed
September 08, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Contract and Indebtedness
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Closed
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I BREACH OF CONTRACT FOR COVERED DAMAGES
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Edmundo Madriz and Gruchenska Madriz against First Protective Insurance Company, also known as Frontline Insurance. The plaintiffs are residents of Broward County, Florida and owned a property located at 1082 SW 156 Ter…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Apr 06, 2020Privilege Log
Date: Apr 06, 2020Response to Request for Production
Date: Apr 06, 2020Notice of Jury Trial
Date: Apr 02, 2020Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Mar 06, 2020Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Feb 22, 2020Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: Feb 04, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: Feb 04, 2020Response
Date: Jan 30, 2020Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Jan 30, 2020Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Jan 16, 2020Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: Jan 16, 2020Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: Jan 06, 2020Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: Jan 06, 2020Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Dec 02, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Dec 02, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: Dec 02, 2019Request for Production
Date: Dec 02, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: Dec 02, 2019Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Dec 02, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
April 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Privilege Log | |
April 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Jury Trial Party: Plaintiff Madriz, Edmundo Plaintiff Madriz, Gruchenska |
|
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERYParty: Defendant First Protective Insurance Company |
|
February 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIALParty: Defendant First Protective Insurance Company |
|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Party: Defendant First Protective Insurance Company |
|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant First Protective Insurance Company |
|
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response and OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANTParty: Defendant First Protective Insurance Company |
|
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories Party: Defendant First Protective Insurance Company |
|
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses TO THE COMPLAINTParty: Defendant First Protective Insurance Company |
|
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Reply to Affirmative Defenses | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Enlargement of Time Party: Defendant First Protective Insurance Company |
|
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Party: Defendant First Protective Insurance Company |
|
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Party: Plaintiff Madriz, Edmundo Plaintiff Madriz, Gruchenska |
|
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Party: Defendant First Protective Insurance Company |
|
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Party: Plaintiff Madriz, Edmundo Plaintiff Madriz, Gruchenska |
|
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs Party: Plaintiff Madriz, Edmundo Plaintiff Madriz, Gruchenska |
|
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) MPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOB JURY TRIALParty: Plaintiff Madriz, Edmundo Plaintiff Madriz, Gruchenska |
|
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Party: Plaintiff Madriz, Edmundo Plaintiff Madriz, Gruchenska |