Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Sonia Aguilar Plaintiff vs. Citizens Property Insurance Corporation Defendant
On October 31, 2019 contract and indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 31, 2019
Last Refreshed
September 08, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Category
Contract and Indebtedness
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Settlement
Overview
A subsequent edition of this Policy; or
An amendatory endorsement.
B. Waiver Or Change Of Policy Provisions
A waiver or change of a provision of this Policy
must be in writing by us to be valid. Our request for
an appraisal or examination will not waive any of
our rights.
C. Cancellation
You may cancel this Policy at any time by
returning it to us or by letting us know in writing
of the date cancellation is to take effect.
If a state of emergency is declared by the
Governor and the Commissioner of Insurance
Regulation files an Emergency Order, and the
“residence premises" has been damaged as a
result of a hurricane or wind loss that is the
subject of the declared emergency, we may
cancel this Policy only for the following
reasons, with respect to the period beginning
from the date the state of emergency is
declared to the expiration of 90 days following
the repairs to the dwelling or other structure
located on the "residence premises", by letting
HOMEOWNERS
Causes of Action
COUNT I—~BREACH OF CONTRACT
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Sonia Aguilar against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation in the Circuit Court of the 17th Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The complaint seeks damages in excess of $15,000, exclusive of interest, attorn…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Notice of Cancellation
Date: Aug 24, 2020Notice of Settlement
Date: Aug 24, 2020Notice of Video Deposition
Date: Jul 13, 2020Notice of Cancellation
Date: Jun 12, 2020Request for Copies
Date: Jun 08, 2020Notice of Video Deposition
Date: Jun 04, 2020Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 22, 2020Notice of Filing
Date: May 22, 2020Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 21, 2020Request for Copies
Date: May 21, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 20, 2020Notice of Cancellation
Date: May 13, 2020Notice of Service
Date: Apr 14, 2020Response to Request for Production
Date: Apr 08, 2020Notice of Service
Date: Apr 08, 2020Notice of Video Deposition
Date: Mar 27, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Mar 25, 2020Notice of Video Deposition
Date: Mar 25, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: Mar 11, 2020Request for Production
Date: Mar 09, 2020Interrogatories
Date: Mar 09, 2020Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: Mar 04, 2020Privilege Log
Date: Feb 26, 2020Response to Request for Admissions
Date: Feb 25, 2020Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: Jan 30, 2020Response to Request for Production
Date: Jan 07, 2020Answer to Interrogs
Date: Jan 07, 2020Response to Request for Admissions
Date: Jan 07, 2020Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Dec 31, 2019Agreed Order
Date: Dec 18, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: Dec 13, 2019Motion to Dismiss
Date: Dec 11, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: Dec 05, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: Nov 26, 2019Notice
Date: Nov 26, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: Oct 31, 2019Request for Admissions
Date: Oct 31, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Oct 31, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: Oct 31, 2019Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Oct 31, 2019Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Oct 31, 2019Request for Production
Date: Oct 31, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Aguilar, Sonia |
|
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Video Deposition SECOND RE-NOTICE |
|
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Video Deposition Sonia Aguilar |
|
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
May 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
April 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
April 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
April 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
March 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Video Deposition Party: Plaintiff Aguilar, Sonia |
|
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Alex Duenas Big Al's Sewer and Drain |
|
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Video Deposition Sonia Aguilar |
|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Plaintiff Aguilar, Sonia |
|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Interrogatories | |
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Privilege Log | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Reply to Affirmative Defenses | |
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer to Interrogs | |
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
December 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order DISMISS COUNT IIParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint Party: Plaintiff Aguilar, Sonia |
|
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss COUNT II -PETITION FOR DECLARATORY RELIEFParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: SAPIR ELAZAR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A196321; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: SAPIR ELAZAR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A196321; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Party: Plaintiff Aguilar, Sonia |
|
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition February 11,2020 10:00 am |
|
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs Party: Plaintiff Aguilar, Sonia |
|
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Aguilar, Sonia |
|
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Party: Plaintiff Aguilar, Sonia |