Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Pennymac Loan Services LLC Plaintiff vs. Wilber Torres Reina, et al Defendant
On May 31, 2019 a 3 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Garcia-Wood, Marina presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 31, 2019
Last Refreshed
October 04, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Judge
Hon. Garcia-Wood, Marina
Category
3
Status
Settlement
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Final Disposition Form
Date: Jun 24, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: May 31, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: May 31, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: May 31, 2019Value Claim Form
Date: May 31, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: May 31, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: May 31, 2019Complaint (eFiled)
Date: May 31, 2019Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: May 31, 2019Civil Cover Sheet
Date: May 31, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Form Dismissed Pursuant to Settlement - Before Hearing |
|
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: BROCK AND SCOTT PLLC ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A078158; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: BROCK AND SCOTT PLLC ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A078158; ;Amount: $906.00 |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Unknown Spouse of Yeilyn Torres |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Wilber Torres Reina |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Yeilyn Torres |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Value Claim Form | |
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Unknown Spouse of Wilber Torres Reina |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Certificate of Possession of Original Note |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) for Foreclosure of MortgageParty: Plaintiff Pennymac Loan Services LLC |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Lis Pendens | |
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet |