Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company Plaintiff vs. Joseph E Castranovo, et al Defendant
On May 31, 2019 a real prop homestead res fore =/>$250,000 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 31, 2019
Last Refreshed
October 03, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Real Prop Homestead Res Fore =/>$250,000
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Stipulated Judgment
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I - MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
COUNT II- REESTABLISHMENT OF PROMISSORY NOTE
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for American Home Mortgage Assets Trust 2006-5, Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2006-5, against Joseph E. Castranovo, Deborah Castra…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Proof of Publication
Date: Feb 22, 2022Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney
Date: Feb 09, 2022Order Cancelling Foreclosure Sale
Date: Feb 08, 2022Notice of Emergency Hearing
Date: Feb 07, 2022Emergency Motion
Date: Feb 07, 2022Proof of Publication
Date: Dec 21, 2021Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney
Date: Dec 08, 2021Order Cancelling Foreclosure Sale
Date: Nov 08, 2021Motion to Cancel Reschedule Foreclosure Sale
Date: Nov 05, 2021Proof of Publication
Date: Sep 30, 2021Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney
Date: Sep 16, 2021Notice of Service
Date: Sep 02, 2021Ord Canceling/Rescheduling Clerks Fclsre Sale
Date: Aug 18, 2021Motion to Cancel Reschedule Foreclosure Sale
Date: Aug 18, 2021Proof of Publication
Date: Jul 28, 2021Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney
Date: Jul 15, 2021Notice of Change of Address
Date: Jun 15, 2021Notice of Filing/Affidavit of Service Returned Served
Date: May 26, 2021Motion to Take Judicial Notice
Date: May 21, 2021Witness Exhibit List
Date: Apr 30, 2021Witness Exhibit List
Date: Apr 29, 2021Notice of Service
Date: Apr 16, 2021Order Granting Continuance
Date: Feb 04, 2021Order Setting
Date: Feb 04, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: Jan 27, 2021Joint Motion to Continue
Date: Jan 19, 2021Witness Exhibit List
Date: Jan 18, 2021Notice of Postponement of Deposition DT
Date: Jan 12, 2021Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Jan 11, 2021Witness Exhibit List
Date: Dec 18, 2020Order Granting Motion
Date: Nov 04, 2020Notice of Service
Date: Nov 02, 2020Amended Witness List
Date: Nov 02, 2020Notice of Postponement of Deposition DT
Date: Oct 28, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: Oct 13, 2020Motion for Protective Order
Date: Oct 09, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: Sep 29, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: Sep 28, 2020Order Setting
Date: Sep 16, 2020Witness Exhibit List
Date: Sep 02, 2020Notice of Service
Date: Jul 22, 2020Witness Exhibit List
Date: Jul 17, 2020Appearance As Attorney of Record
Date: Jun 26, 2020Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: Jun 23, 2020Order Setting
Date: Jun 22, 2020Order Granting Motion for Continuance
Date: Jun 03, 2020Motion for Continuance
Date: Jun 02, 2020Response to Request for Admissions
Date: Jun 01, 2020Motion
Date: Jun 01, 2020Notice of Service
Date: May 05, 2020Witness Exhibit List
Date: May 05, 2020Order Setting
Date: Apr 14, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: Apr 13, 2020Request for Admissions
Date: Apr 05, 2020Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: Mar 24, 2020Motion
Date: Mar 24, 2020Notice of Service
Date: Mar 02, 2020Witness Exhibit List
Date: Mar 02, 2020Order Setting
Date: Feb 19, 2020Order Setting Final Hrg/Pretrial Procedures
Date: Feb 19, 2020Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: Feb 07, 2020Request for Admissions
Date: Feb 07, 2020Notice of Readiness for Trial
Date: Feb 07, 2020Request for Production of Documents
Date: Feb 07, 2020Notice of Service
Date: Jan 17, 2020Notice of Service
Date: Jan 16, 2020Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Jan 15, 2020Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Jan 15, 2020Notice of Service
Date: Jan 13, 2020Response to Request for Production
Date: Jan 13, 2020Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: Jan 13, 2020Amended Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Dec 23, 2019Notice of Service
Date: Dec 11, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Dec 10, 2019Order of Default
Date: Dec 09, 2019Order Granting Motion to Strike
Date: Dec 09, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Dec 09, 2019Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses
Date: Dec 06, 2019Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Dec 04, 2019Motion for Default
Date: Nov 12, 2019Notice of Service
Date: Sep 20, 2019Order Granting Motion
Date: Sep 09, 2019Order Extending Time
Date: Sep 09, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Sep 09, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Sep 09, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: Aug 21, 2019Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic
Date: Aug 09, 2019Motion for Default Default
Date: Aug 09, 2019Summons Returned Served
Date: Jul 24, 2019Summons Returned Served
Date: Jul 24, 2019Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted
Date: Jul 24, 2019Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted
Date: Jul 24, 2019Summons Returned Served
Date: Jul 24, 2019Summons Returned Served
Date: Jul 24, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: Jul 19, 2019Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Jul 18, 2019Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: Jul 02, 2019Interrogatories
Date: Jun 17, 2019Request to Produce
Date: Jun 17, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: Jun 17, 2019Civil Cover Sheet
Date: May 31, 2019Value Claim Form
Date: May 31, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: May 31, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: May 31, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: May 31, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: May 31, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: May 31, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: May 31, 2019Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: May 31, 2019Complaint (eFiled)
Date: May 31, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2022 | hearing | Foreclosure Sale | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney 10:00 a.m. on the 12th day of April, 2022 |
|
February 08, 2022 | hearing |
Foreclosure Sale Per Order |
|
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Cancelling Foreclosure Sale April 12,2022- No Further Cancellations without Plaintiff |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Emergency Hearing Tuesday, February 8,2022, at 8:45 a.m |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Emergency Motion DEFENDANT'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO CANCEL AND RESCHEDULE THE FORECLOSURE SALEParty: Defendant Castranovo, Deborah |
|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney at 10:00 a.m. on the 8th day of February, 2022Party: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank National Trust Company |
|
November 16, 2021 | hearing |
Foreclosure Sale Per Order |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Cancelling Foreclosure Sale February 8, 2022 |
|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Cancel & Reschedule Foreclosure Sale PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CANCEL AND RESCHEDULE JUDICIAL SALE |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service OF CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENTParty: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank National Trust Company |
|
August 31, 2021 | hearing |
Foreclosure Sale Per Order |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Ord Canceling/Rescheduling Clerk's Fclsre Sale | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Cancel & Reschedule Foreclosure Sale scheduled for August 31, 2021Party: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank National Trust Company |
|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address Party: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank National Trust Company |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing/Affidavit of Service Returned Served Party: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank National Trust Company |
|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Take Judicial Notice Party: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank National Trust Company |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Witness & Exhibit List | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Witness & Exhibit List | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Continuance ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SCHEDULED FEBRUARY 17, 2021 |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting non jt |
|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Joint Motion to Continue TRIAL SCHEDULED FEBRUARY 17, 2021Party: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank National Trust Company |
|
January 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Witness & Exhibit List | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Postponement of Deposition DT | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Witness & Exhibit List | |
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND OBJECTIONS TO ACCOMPANYING DOCUMENT REOUEST |
|
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Amended Witness List | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Postponement of Deposition DT | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Protective Order NON-PARTY XIOMARA GRAFTON AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND OBJECTIONS TO THE ACCOMPANING DOCUMENT REOUEST |
|
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting non jt |
|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Witness & Exhibit List | |
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
July 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Witness & Exhibit List | |
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Appearance As Attorney of Record Francis Mota #115152Party: Defendant Castranovo, Joseph E Defendant Castranovo, Deborah |
|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses | |
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting non jt |
|
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ord Setting Non-Jury Trial 09-16-2020 9:00 AM |
|
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion for Continuance | |
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance NON-JURY TRIALParty: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank National Trust Company |
|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions AS TO COVID DISASTER RELIEF HOUSING BAILOUT FUNDSParty: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank National Trust Company |
|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion AS TO COVID DISASTER RELIEF HOUSING BAILOUT FUNDSParty: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank National Trust Company |
|
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Witness & Exhibit List | |
April 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting non jt |
|
April 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ord Setting Non-Jury Trial 06-23-2020 9:00 AM |
|
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions | |
March 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Discovery PLAINTIFF'S |
|
March 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AGAINS T DEFENDANT, JUAN F. VIDA A/K/A JUAN VIDEA ADMITTED |
|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Witness & Exhibit List | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting non jt |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Final Hrg/Pretrial Procedures 04/15/20 9:00 AM RM 4150 |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ord Setting Non-Jury Trial AND PRETRIAL PROCEDURES; 4/15/2020 @ 9:00 am, ROOM 4150 |
|
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions | |
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Readiness for Trial | |
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Production of Documents | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 02-19-2020 8:45 AM |
|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference | |
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Reply to Affirmative Defenses | |
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Amended Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Castranovo, Joseph E |
|
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 01-15-2020 @ 8:45 AM. Rm 15160 |
|
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Default For Judicial is hereby Moot. |
|
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion to Strike On Reply to and Strike Affirmative Defenses of Defendants Joseph Castranovo and Deborah Castranovo |
|
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 01-15-2020 8:45 AM; ROOM 15160 |
|
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANTS, JOSEPH E. CASTRANOVO /K/A JOSEPH EDWARD CASTRANOVO A/K/A JOSEPH CASTRANOVO AND DEBORAH CASTRANOVO A/K/A DEBORAH ANN CASRANOVO A/K/A D. CASTRANOVOParty: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank National Trust Company |
|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Castranovo, Joseph E |
|
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Party: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank National Trust Company |
|
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion TO ABATE DISCOVERY UNTIL AN ANSWER HAS BEEN FILED OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO REPOND TO DEFENDANTS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION AND FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES |
|
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiff' s Complaint |
|
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference rm 15160 12-09-2019 8:45 AM |
|
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 12-09-2019 8:45 AM; ROOM 15160 |
|
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DEBORAH CASTRANOVO A/K/A DEBORAH ANN CASTRANOVO A/K/A D. CASTRANOVO and UNKNOWN SOUSE OF JOSEPH E. CASTRANOVO A/K/A JOSEPH EDWARD CASTRANOVO A/K/A JOSEPH CASTRANOVO |
|
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default AGAINSTParty: Defendant Ocean Mile Association Inc Defendant Maplewood Isle Association Inc |
|
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 10th day of June, 2019Party: Defendant Maplewood Isle Association Inc |
|
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 18th day of July, 2019Party: Defendant Ocean Mile Association Inc |
|
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOSEPH E. CASTRANOVO A/K/A JOSEPH EDWARD CASTRANOVO A/K/A JOSEPH CASTRANOVO |
|
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DEBORAH CASTRANOVO A/K/A DEBORAH ANN CASTRANOVO A/K/A D. CASTRANOVO |
|
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 29th day of June, 2019Party: Defendant Castranovo, Joseph E |
|
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 10th day of June, 2019Party: Defendant Castranovo, Deborah |
|
July 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Castranovo, Joseph E |
|
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ABATE DISCOVERY UNTIL AN ANSWER HAS BEEN FILED OR INTHE ALTERNATIVE FOR EXTENSON OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT, JOSEPH E. CASTRANOVO A/K/A JOSEPH EDWARD CASTRANOVO WK/AJOSEPH-ASTRANOVO'S FIRST REQUEST FORPRODUCTION AND FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIESParty: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank National Trust Company |
|
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Enlargement of Time Party: Defendant Castranovo, Joseph E Defendant Castranovo, Deborah |
|
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Interrogatories DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIESParty: Defendant Castranovo, Joseph E |
|
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request to Produce Party: Defendant Castranovo, Joseph E |
|
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: MWC PC ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A077236; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Defendant Count > than 5 Payor: MWC PC ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A077236; ;Amount: $12.50 |
|
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: MWC PC ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A077236; ;Amount: $1,906.00 |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Value Claim Form | |
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Unknown Spouse of Joseph E. Castranovo |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Unknown Spouse of Deborah Castranovo |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance The Maple Wood Isle Association, Inc |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Deborah Castranovo a/Ida Deborah Ann Castranovo a/Ida D. Castranovo |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | eSummons Issuance | |
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Joseph E. Castranovo |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Lis Pendens | |
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank National Trust Company |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet |