Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Alim Sharif Plaintiff vs. Camden Summit Partnership LP Defendant
On May 31, 2019 a 3 case was filed by Sharif, Alim, against Camden Summit Partnership Lp, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Judge AP, Appeals presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 31, 2019
Last Refreshed
September 27, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Judge
Hon. Judge AP, Appeals
Category
3
Status
Appealed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Notice of Related Cases
Date: Feb 02, 2021Order
Date: Jan 09, 2021Acknowledgment
Date: Jan 07, 2021Order
Date: Jan 06, 2021Order
Date: Dec 16, 2020Order On Motion for Contempt
Date: Nov 09, 2020Motion for Contempt
Date: Sep 17, 2020Order to Show Cause
Date: Apr 26, 2020Appellants Initial Brief
Date: Jan 10, 2020Order
Date: Dec 10, 2019Response
Date: Dec 02, 2019Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Nov 15, 2019Order to Show Cause
Date: Sep 23, 2019Record on Appeal
Date: Jul 23, 2019Acknowledgment
Date: Jun 05, 2019Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal
Date: May 31, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Related Cases | |
January 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order SECOND AMENDED TRANSFER OF PENDING APPEALS FROM THE 17TH CIRCUIT |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgment 4D21-0053 |
|
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order AMENDED TRANSFER OF PENDING APPEALS FROM THE 17TH CIRCUIT |
|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order TRANSFER OF PENDING APPEALS FROM THE 17TH CIRCUIT |
|
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Order On Motion for Contempt | |
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Contempt | |
April 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Appellant's Initial Brief | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE |
|
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Response TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
|
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion for Extension of Time | |
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO FILE INITIAL BRIEF |
|
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Record on Appeal | |
July 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Appeals - Preparation Fee Payor: ALIM SHARIF ; Userid: CTS-cthomas ; Receipt: 20191AP1A000770; omments: MO#17-67183481 ;Amount: $25.20 |
|
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Final Bill Appeal Preparation fees pending in amount of: | |
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Appeals - Preparation Fee Payor: ALIM SHARIF ; Userid: CTS-vallwardt ; Receipt: 20191AP1A000599; omments: MO 17-971977561 ;Amount: $51.80 |
|
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Appeals - Signing and Sealing Payor: ALIM SHARIF ; Userid: CTS-vallwardt ; Receipt: 20191AP1A000599; omments: MO 17-971977561 ;Amount: $7.00 |
|
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Pre-billed Appellant pending payment of: | |
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal | |
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | No Cover Sheet | |
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | No Summons Issued | |
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: ALIM SHARIF ; Userid: CTS-tbrown ; Receipt: 20191YE1D000742; omments: MC ;Amount: $281.00 |