Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Janice Gee Plaintiff vs. Citizens Property Insurance Corporation Defendant
On January 26, 2018 contract and indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Perlman, Sandra presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 26, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Jack Ben;Category
Contract and Indebtedness
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Dismissal
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I BREACH OF CONTRACT
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Janice Gee against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation. Janice Gee is a resident of Broward, Florida and is suing for damages under an insurance policy due to the loss of property. The value of the property is state…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Stipulation for Dismissal
Date: Sep 10, 2018Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: Jul 18, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Jul 05, 2018Notice of Jury Trial
Date: Jul 05, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Jun 07, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: May 16, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: May 09, 2018Request to Produce
Date: May 07, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: May 07, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: Apr 02, 2018Response
Date: Apr 02, 2018Notice
Date: Apr 02, 2018Privilege Log
Date: Apr 02, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: Feb 26, 2018Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Feb 23, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: Feb 14, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Feb 14, 2018Notice of Service
Date: Feb 07, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Jan 26, 2018Interrogatories
Date: Jan 26, 2018Request for Production
Date: Jan 26, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: Jan 26, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 26, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 26, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 26, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE |
|
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Discovery RESPONSES TOParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Jury Trial | |
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERYParty: Plaintiff Gee, Janice |
|
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Party: Plaintiff Gee, Janice |
|
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request to Produce Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Request to Produce DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REOUEST FOR PRODUCTIONParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REOUEST FOR ADMISSIONSParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIESParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Privilege Log DEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG FILED IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DEMANDSParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Nancy I. Stein-McCarthy Florida Bar No. 183555Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Nancy I. Stein-McCarthy Florida Bar No. 183555Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: Jack BenMELEH ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A013482; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: Jack BenMELEH ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A013482; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATIONParty: Plaintiff Gee, Janice |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Interrogatories CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATIONParty: Plaintiff Gee, Janice |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATIONParty: Plaintiff Gee, Janice |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATIONParty: Plaintiff Gee, Janice |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint (eFiled) | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet |