Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Melane Nelson Plaintiff vs. Gilbert Hardy Defendant
On January 26, 2018 an auto negligence case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 26, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Auto Negligence
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Dismissal
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Melane Nelson against Gilbert Hardy for injuries sustained in an auto accident. The complaint states that Melane Nelson is seeking damages in excess of $15,000. Melane Nelson is an individual residing in Broward County,…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Stipulation for Dismissal
Date: Sep 25, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Aug 13, 2018Agreed Order
Date: Jul 22, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: Jul 20, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Jul 16, 2018Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Jul 12, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Jun 22, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: May 21, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: May 14, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: May 14, 2018Privilege Log
Date: May 14, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 14, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: May 02, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Apr 04, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Mar 05, 2018Request for Production
Date: Mar 05, 2018Notice of Interrogatories
Date: Mar 05, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: Mar 05, 2018Answer
Date: Feb 21, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 26, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: Jan 26, 2018Request for Production
Date: Jan 26, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: Jan 26, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 26, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 26, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Dismissal with prejudice |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
July 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES /GRANTED |
|
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
July 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories Party: Plaintiff Nelson, Melane |
|
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY SERVED WITH SUMMONS AND COMPLAINTParty: Plaintiff Nelson, Melane |
|
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Privilege Log | |
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories | |
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERYParty: Plaintiff Nelson, Melane |
|
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Hardy, Gilbert |
|
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Party: Defendant Hardy, Gilbert |
|
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatories Party: Defendant Hardy, Gilbert |
|
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Party: Defendant Hardy, Gilbert |
|
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer Party: Defendant Hardy, Gilbert |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Party: Defendant Hardy, Gilbert |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint (eFiled) | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: GLEN BARRY LEVINE ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A013316; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: GLEN BARRY LEVINE ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A013316; ;Amount: $10.00 |