Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Phyllis Smith Plaintiff vs. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Defendant
On January 26, 2018 an other - insurance claim case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Singer, Michele Towbin presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 26, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Other - Insurance Claim
Practice Area
Insurance
Matter Type
Insurance Coverage
Status
Closed
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT TWO — DECLARATORY RELIEF
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Phyllis Smith against Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, subscribing to Policy Number BVH0000334. The plaintiff is seeking damages in excess of $15,000, exclusive of court costs, attorney's fees, and interest. The…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Answer to Complaint
Date: Feb 20, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 26, 2018Notice of Interrogatories
Date: Jan 26, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 26, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 26, 2018Request to Produce
Date: Jan 26, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSESParty: Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Party: Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Interrogatories | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint (eFiled) | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Request to Produce | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: JAY M ARNESEN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A013314; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: JAY M ARNESEN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A013314; ;Amount: $401.00 |