Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Juan Carlos Mera, et al Plaintiff vs. Florida Peninsula Insurance Company Defendant
On January 26, 2018 an other - insurance claim case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Perlman, Sandra presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 26, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Other - Insurance Claim
Practice Area
Insurance
Matter Type
Insurance Coverage
Status
Closed
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Juan Carlos Mera and Paoli Mera against Florida Peninsula Insurance Company. The plaintiffs are seeking damages in excess of $15,000. The plaintiffs are residents of Broward County, Florida, while the defendant is an in…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: Jan 17, 2020Motion for Mediation
Date: Mar 18, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: Jun 15, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: Jun 15, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Apr 17, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: Apr 13, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: Mar 29, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Mar 26, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: Mar 26, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: Mar 21, 2018Request for Production
Date: Mar 15, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: Mar 15, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: Mar 15, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: Mar 10, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: Mar 08, 2018Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Mar 07, 2018Agreed Order
Date: Mar 06, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: Mar 01, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Feb 23, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: Jan 26, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: Jan 26, 2018Request for Production
Date: Jan 26, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 26, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 26, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: Jan 26, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 26, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing | |
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Mediation MOTION FOR REFERRAL TO MEDIATIONParty: Plaintiff Mera, Juan Carlos Plaintiff Mera, Paoli |
|
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Plaintiff Mera, Juan Carlos Plaintiff Mera, Paoli |
|
April 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of No Objection | |
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request to Produce | |
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Party: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs Party: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Party: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
March 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Reply to Affirmative Defenses | |
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order ON DEFENDANT, FLORIDA PENINSULA INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT-GRANTED |
|
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Enlargement of Time Party: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance HAILEY GOLDMAN, ESQ. Florida Bar Number: 144071Party: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: KENNETH R DUBOFF ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A013239; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint (eFiled) | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance FLORIDA PENINSULA INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: KENNETH R DUBOFF ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A013239; ;Amount: $401.00 |