Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Sonja Fuller Plaintiff vs. American Integrity Insurance Company of Florida Defendant
On January 26, 2018 an other - insurance claim case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Bowman, John B. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 26, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Other - Insurance Claim
Practice Area
Insurance
Matter Type
Insurance Coverage
Status
Dismissal
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I- BREACH OF CONTRACT
COUNT II PETITION FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Sonja Fuller against American Integrity Insurance Company of Florida. The complaint states that the Plaintiff is seeking damages in excess of $15,000, exclusive of interest, attorney fees, and costs. The Defendant is an…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Mar 28, 2019Notice
Date: Sep 11, 2018Notice of Settlement
Date: Aug 06, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Jul 25, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Jul 12, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: Jul 02, 2018Motion to Set Cause for Trial
Date: Jul 02, 2018Notice to Set Case for Trial
Date: Jun 25, 2018Request for Production
Date: Jun 25, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: Jun 25, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: Jun 25, 2018Answer to Affirmative Defenses
Date: Jun 22, 2018Motion for Default
Date: Jun 22, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: Jun 22, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: Jun 22, 2018Request for Production
Date: Jun 22, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: Jun 22, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Jun 20, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: Jun 20, 2018Privilege Log
Date: Jun 20, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: Jun 12, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: May 21, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: May 03, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Apr 20, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: Jan 26, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: Jan 26, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 26, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 26, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 26, 2018Request for Production
Date: Jan 26, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: Jan 26, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference | |
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICEParty: Plaintiff Fuller, Sonja | |
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Fuller, Sonja |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S WRITTEN DISCOVERY REOUESTSParty: Plaintiff Fuller, Sonja |
|
July 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Party: Plaintiff Fuller, Sonja |
|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Set Cause for Trial Party: Plaintiff Fuller, Sonja |
|
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice to Set Case for Trial Party: Plaintiff Fuller, Sonja |
|
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions | |
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant American Integrity Insurance Company of Florida |
|
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default by the Court against Defendant AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDAParty: Plaintiff Fuller, Sonja |
|
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel VERIFIED AND BETTER RESPONSESParty: Plaintiff Fuller, Sonja |
|
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel AND FOR IN-CAMERA INSPECTIONParty: Plaintiff Fuller, Sonja |
|
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Party: Defendant American Integrity Insurance Company of Florida |
|
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs Party: Defendant American Integrity Insurance Company of Florida |
|
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request to Produce | |
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Privilege Log | |
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint Party: Defendant American Integrity Insurance Company of Florida |
|
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Party: Defendant American Integrity Insurance Company of Florida |
|
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses (AMENDED) LANCE B. STEPHAN, ESQ. Florida Bar No: 117972Party: Plaintiff Fuller, Sonja |
|
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant American Integrity Insurance Company of Florida |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses John A SalcedoParty: Plaintiff Fuller, Sonja |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum of any and all corporate representative(s)Party: Defendant American Integrity Insurance Company of Florida |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint (eFiled) | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: PETER J. MINEO ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A013227; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: PETER J. MINEO ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A013227; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance American Integrity Insurance Company of Florida |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production American Integrity Insurance Company of FloridaParty: Plaintiff Fuller, Sonja |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs American Integrity Insurance Company of FloridaParty: Plaintiff Fuller, Sonja |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet |