Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Michael Oliver Lancanan Plaintiff vs. Susan Diaz Crisologo Defendant
On January 26, 2018 contract and indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Perlman, Sandra presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 26, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Contract and Indebtedness
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Closed
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Michael Oliver Lancanan against Susan Diaz Crisologo in the Circuit Court of the 17th Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The complaint alleges that the defendant breached two promissory notes and seeks a judgm…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Order
Date: Mar 09, 2020Order
Date: Mar 02, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: Mar 02, 2020Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: Oct 09, 2019Order On Case Management Conference
Date: Oct 03, 2019Order
Date: Sep 05, 2019Order Granting Motion to Withdraw
Date: Sep 05, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Sep 05, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: Aug 21, 2019Motion for Continuance
Date: Aug 19, 2019Motion for Summary Final Judgment
Date: Aug 17, 2019Motion to Withdraw
Date: Jul 31, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: Jul 31, 2019Notice of Unavailability
Date: Jul 15, 2019Notice of Mediation
Date: Jul 09, 2019Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial
Date: Jul 02, 2019Order Granting Motion to Compel
Date: Jun 12, 2019Notice of Unavailability
Date: May 14, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: May 07, 2019Motion
Date: May 06, 2019Notice of Unavailability
Date: May 01, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: Apr 19, 2019Notice of Unavailability
Date: Feb 04, 2019Notice of Compliance
Date: Jan 11, 2019Ex Parte Order to Compel
Date: Dec 21, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: Dec 20, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: Dec 11, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: Nov 02, 2018Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: Oct 01, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Jul 30, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: Jul 30, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Jul 27, 2018Request for Production of Documents
Date: Jun 29, 2018Request for Production
Date: Jun 08, 2018Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
Date: Jun 08, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: Mar 01, 2018Appearance As Attorney of Record
Date: Feb 21, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: Jan 31, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 26, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 26, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 26, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order On Motion for determination that defendant is the prevailing party |
|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Order | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Attorney Fees and Court CostsParty: Defendant Crisologo, Susan Diaz |
|
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Order On Case Management Conference | |
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order GRANTING CANCELLATION OF TRIAL ORDER |
|
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion to Withdraw | |
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 10/3/2019 9:00 AM ROOM 16165 |
|
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance MOTION TO CANCEL TRIAL ORDERParty: Defendant Crisologo, Susan Diaz |
|
August 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Final Judgment Party: Defendant Crisologo, Susan Diaz |
|
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw Party: Plaintiff Lancanan, Michael Oliver |
|
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial CALENDAR CALL: 09-20-2019 |
|
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion to Compel BETTER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION AND FOR OTHER RELIEF |
|
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
May 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCEParty: Plaintiff Lancanan, Michael Oliver |
|
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
April 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Party: Plaintiff Lancanan, Michael Oliver |
|
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Compliance | |
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Order to Compel | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request to Produce | |
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel EX-PARTEParty: Plaintiff Lancanan, Michael Oliver |
|
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Discovery TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF' COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERYParty: Defendant Crisologo, Susan Diaz |
|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Plaintiff Lancanan, Michael Oliver |
|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability August 1, 2018 through and including August 8, 2018. September 17, 2018 through and including Sepember 26, 2018 |
|
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories | |
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Production of Documents | |
June 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Party: Plaintiff Lancanan, Michael Oliver |
|
June 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Propounding Interrogatories Party: Plaintiff Lancanan, Michael Oliver |
|
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint Party: Defendant Crisologo, Susan Diaz |
|
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Appearance As Attorney of Record | |
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Susan Diaz Crisologo |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint (eFiled) | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: DARLENE R. GIMBLE ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A013172; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: DARLENE R. GIMBLE ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A013172; ;Amount: $401.00 |