Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Monica Radu Plaintiff vs. Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company Defendant
On January 26, 2018 an other - insurance claim case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Phillips, Carol-Lisa presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 26, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Judge
Hon. Phillips, Carol-Lisa
Category
Other - Insurance Claim
Practice Area
Insurance
Matter Type
Insurance Coverage
Status
Closed
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I- BREACH OF CONTRACT
COUNT II PETITION FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Monica Radu against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The complaint states that the Plaintiff is seeking damages in excess of $15,000, exclusive of interest, attorney fees, and costs. The Defendant is an …...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline
Date: Dec 12, 2018Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: Nov 15, 2018Consent to Substitution of Counsel
Date: Nov 15, 2018Notice
Date: Nov 02, 2018Mediation Report
Date: Aug 31, 2018Certificate
Date: Aug 29, 2018Request for Production
Date: Aug 24, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: Aug 24, 2018Certificate
Date: Aug 21, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: Aug 16, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Aug 03, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: Aug 03, 2018Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Jul 27, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: Jul 27, 2018Agreed Order
Date: Jul 24, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Jun 21, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Mar 28, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: Mar 14, 2018Motion for Protective Order
Date: Mar 12, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Feb 26, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: Jan 26, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: Jan 26, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 26, 2018Request for Production
Date: Jan 26, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 26, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 26, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: Jan 26, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline | |
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Consent to Substitution of Counsel Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE FOR TRIALParty: Plaintiff Radu, Monica | |
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE FOR TRIALParty: Plaintiff Radu, Monica | |
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY PURSUANT TO RULE 1.720Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
August 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories | |
August 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request to Produce | |
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss / PETITION FOR DECLARATORY RELIEFParty: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Agreed Order | |
June 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference Mandatory-7/23/2018 8:45am #15175 |
|
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance OF CO-COUNSEL AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS DESIGNATIONParty: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Enlargement of Time DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND DISCOVERY REOUESTS |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Protective Order Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Todd E. Brant, Esq. / FBN: 0179310Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANTParty: Plaintiff Radu, Monica |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANT'S DESIGNATED CORPORATE REPRESENTATVE(S) WITH THE MOST KNOWLEDGE PURSUANT TO RULE 1.310(b)(6)Party: Plaintiff Radu, Monica |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Radu, Monica |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANTParty: Plaintiff Radu, Monica |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: PETER J. MINEO ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A013093; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: PETER J. MINEO ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A013093; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet |