Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
George Paul Kalbermatter Plaintiff vs. Onassis Auto Transportation Corporation Defendant
On January 26, 2018 an other - discrimination employment or other case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Phillips, Carol-Lisa presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 26, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Judge
Hon. Phillips, Carol-Lisa
Category
Other - Discrimination Employment or Other
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Matter Type
Discrimination
Status
Closed
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT 1 BREACH OF WRITTEN EMPLOYMENT CONTRACT
COUNT IIT UNJUST ENRICHMENT
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by George Paul Kalbermatter against Onassis Auto Transportation Corp. The plaintiff alleges that he was hired by the defendant as a Floor Supervisor and had a written employment agreement. According to the agreement, the p…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Jun 12, 2020Alias Summons Returned Served
Date: Sep 18, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Sep 06, 2019Affidavit of Lost Summons
Date: Aug 29, 2019Case Management Conference Order
Date: Aug 29, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Aug 15, 2019Consent
Date: Jul 24, 2019Order Granting Motion to Withdraw
Date: Jul 24, 2019Motion to Withdraw
Date: Apr 10, 2019Order Extending Time
Date: Mar 27, 2019Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Mar 27, 2019Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Feb 22, 2019Order Extending Time
Date: Feb 22, 2019Agreed Order
Date: Jan 15, 2019Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Jan 14, 2019Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: Nov 29, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: Nov 29, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: Oct 30, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Oct 29, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: Sep 26, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: Aug 16, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: Aug 09, 2018Order
Date: Aug 08, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Jul 10, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: Jun 01, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 26, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 26, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 26, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference | |
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Alias Summons Returned Served 9/10/2019Party: Defendant Onassis Auto Transportation Corporation |
|
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference | |
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Lost Summons Party: Defendant Onassis Auto Transportation Corporation |
|
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Order AND NOTICE OF HEARING ON 10/2/19 @ 8:45 AM RM 15175 |
|
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: GEORGE KALBERMATTER ; Userid: CTS-mbyrd ; Receipt: 20191YE1G001180; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Alias h/b to petParty: Defendant Onassis Auto Transportation Corporation |
|
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 08-29-2019 8:45 AM; ROOM 15175 |
|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Comment: NHEA, ENVELOPES LEFT IN JUDGES BOX |
|
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Consent | |
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion to Withdraw | |
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw AS COUNSELParty: Plaintiff Kalbermatter, George Paul |
|
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Time TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT |
|
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINTParty: Plaintiff Kalbermatter, George Paul |
|
February 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Plaintiff Kalbermatter, George Paul |
|
February 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Time TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT |
|
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT |
|
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Plaintiff Kalbermatter, George Paul |
|
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Enlargement of Time Party: Plaintiff Kalbermatter, George Paul |
|
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Time TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT |
|
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time | |
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINTParty: Plaintiff Kalbermatter, George Paul |
|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Enlargement of Time Party: Plaintiff Kalbermatter, George Paul |
|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time | |
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Enlargement of Time TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINTParty: Plaintiff Kalbermatter, George Paul |
|
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order "EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT |
|
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINTParty: Plaintiff Kalbermatter, George Paul |
|
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Enlargement of Time Party: Plaintiff Kalbermatter, George Paul |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIALParty: Plaintiff Kalbermatter, George Paul |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance ONASSIS AUTO TRANSPORTATION CORP |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: NOAH E. STORCH ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A012915; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: NOAH E. STORCH ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A012915; ;Amount: $10.00 |