Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Miguel Villagomez Plaintiff vs. Safepoint Insurance Company Defendant
On January 24, 2018 an other - insurance claim case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Phillips, Carol-Lisa presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 24, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Judge
Hon. Phillips, Carol-Lisa
Category
Other - Insurance Claim
Practice Area
Insurance
Matter Type
Insurance Coverage
Status
Settlement
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I—~ BREACH OF CONTRACT
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Miguel Villagomez against SafePoint Insurance Company. The complaint alleges that Miguel Villagomez is the owner of real and personal property in Florida and holds a valid insurance policy with SafePoint Insurance Compa…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Notice of Settlement
Date: Sep 10, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: May 26, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: May 11, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Apr 26, 2018Motion to Strike
Date: Apr 05, 2018Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Mar 16, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Mar 12, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Feb 16, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: Jan 31, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Jan 29, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 24, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 24, 2018Request to Produce
Date: Jan 24, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: Jan 24, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: Jan 24, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 24, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Villagomez, Miguel |
|
May 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time | |
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERYParty: Defendant Safepoint Insurance Company |
|
April 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike DEFENDANT'S ALLEGED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSESParty: Plaintiff Villagomez, Miguel |
|
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Safepoint Insurance Company |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Safepoint Insurance Company |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Safepoint Insurance Company |
|
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Safepoint Insurance Company |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: JESSE LONG ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A012042; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: JESSE LONG ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A012042; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance SAFEPOINT INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Villagomez, Miguel |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request to Produce Party: Plaintiff Villagomez, Miguel |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs Party: Plaintiff Villagomez, Miguel |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Party: Plaintiff Villagomez, Miguel |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet |