Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Nadir A Khan, et al Plaintiff vs. Citizens Property Insurance Corporation Defendant
On January 24, 2018 contract and indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Frink, Keathan B. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 24, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Contract and Indebtedness
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Closed
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Nadir A. Khan and Rosa M. Khan against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation for breach of contract. The plaintiffs allege that they had a homeowner's insurance policy with the defendant, and the policy was in effect …...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Notice of Cancellation
Date: Jan 03, 2019Notice of Withdrawal
Date: Dec 06, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: Dec 06, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Dec 04, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: Nov 20, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: Nov 20, 2018Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: Sep 11, 2018Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: Sep 11, 2018Notice of Charging Lien
Date: Aug 16, 2018Motion to Withdraw
Date: Aug 03, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: Jul 05, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Jul 05, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: Apr 06, 2018Request to Produce
Date: Apr 06, 2018Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Mar 29, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: Mar 08, 2018Privilege Log
Date: Mar 08, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Mar 08, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: Mar 08, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: Feb 13, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Feb 13, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 24, 2018Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
Date: Jan 24, 2018Request for Production
Date: Jan 24, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: Jan 24, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 24, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal | |
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel DEPOSITION DATESParty: Plaintiff Khan, Nadir A Plaintiff Khan, Rosa M |
|
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel Bar #100545 Patrick Graves, Esq.Party: Plaintiff Khan, Nadir A Plaintiff Khan, Rosa M |
|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel FBN # 100545Party: Plaintiff Khan, Nadir A Plaintiff Khan, Rosa M |
|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Charging Lien | |
August 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw AS PLAINTIFF'S COUNSELParty: Plaintiff Khan, Nadir A Plaintiff Khan, Rosa M |
|
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories | |
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request to Produce Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' REOUEST FOR ADMISSIONSParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Privilege Log DEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG FILED IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DEMANDSParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS' INTERROGATORIESParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' REOUEST FOR PRODUCTIONParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability from July 1, 2018 through and including July 7, 2018; August 16,2018 through and including August 2, 2018 |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSESParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: ROGER A ALVAREZ ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A011931; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: ROGER A ALVAREZ ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A011931; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Propounding Interrogatories TO CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATIONParty: Plaintiff Khan, Nadir A Plaintiff Khan, Rosa M |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production TO CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATIONParty: Plaintiff Khan, Nadir A Plaintiff Khan, Rosa M |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions TO CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATIONParty: Plaintiff Khan, Nadir A Plaintiff Khan, Rosa M |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) FOR BREACH OF CONTRACTParty: Plaintiff Khan, Nadir A Plaintiff Khan, Rosa M |