Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
HSBC Bank USA National Association Plaintiff vs. Harold Zabrowski, et al Defendant
On January 24, 2018 a real prop homestead res fore =/>$250,000 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 24, 2018
Last Refreshed
October 02, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Real Prop Homestead Res Fore =/>$250,000
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Stipulated Judgment
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT ONE: FORECLOSURE
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Midfirst Bank against Harold Zabrowski and Heather Frey, among others, in the Circuit Court of the Seventeenth Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The complaint alleges that Zabrowski and F…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Certificate of Title
Date: Feb 18, 2020Certificate of Disbursements
Date: Feb 18, 2020Bid Sheet
Date: Feb 05, 2020Certificate of Sale
Date: Feb 05, 2020Proof of Publication
Date: Jan 22, 2020Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney
Date: Jan 07, 2020Affidavit of Costs
Date: Dec 17, 2019Affidavit of Attorney Fees
Date: Dec 17, 2019Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing
Date: Dec 04, 2019Order Granting Motion
Date: Dec 03, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: Dec 03, 2019Final Disposition Form
Date: Dec 03, 2019Affidavit of Attorney Fees
Date: Dec 03, 2019Supplemental Witness List
Date: Nov 25, 2019Notice of Service
Date: Oct 11, 2019Witness List
Date: Oct 11, 2019Order Setting
Date: Aug 27, 2019Order Setting
Date: Aug 27, 2019Order of Continuance
Date: Aug 27, 2019Supplemental Witness List
Date: Jul 24, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: Jul 15, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: Jul 10, 2019Notice of Service
Date: Jul 10, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: Jul 01, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Jun 25, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Jun 25, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: Jun 18, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: Jun 13, 2019Affidavit of Attorney Fees
Date: Jun 13, 2019Affidavit in Support
Date: Jun 13, 2019Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: Jun 12, 2019Notice of Withdrawal
Date: Jun 05, 2019Motion for Summary Final Judgment
Date: Jun 05, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: Jun 05, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: May 20, 2019Notice of Service
Date: May 10, 2019Witness List
Date: May 10, 2019Exhibit List
Date: May 10, 2019Notice of Service
Date: May 09, 2019Motion for Substitution of Party(S)
Date: May 08, 2019Order Setting
Date: May 06, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: May 06, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: May 06, 2019Order Setting
Date: May 06, 2019Request for Production of Documents
Date: May 06, 2019Notice
Date: Mar 11, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Mar 06, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Mar 06, 2019Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: Mar 05, 2019Cross Notice
Date: Feb 28, 2019Cross Notice
Date: Feb 26, 2019Notice of Service
Date: Feb 15, 2019Notice of Service
Date: Feb 13, 2019Motion to Consolidate
Date: Jan 28, 2019Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Jan 28, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Jan 22, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Jan 22, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: Jan 21, 2019Notice of Service
Date: Jan 07, 2019Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Jan 03, 2019Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Jan 03, 2019Motion for Default
Date: Jan 02, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: Dec 19, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Dec 15, 2018Notice of Service
Date: Dec 10, 2018Order Denying Motion to Dismiss
Date: Dec 05, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Dec 05, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Nov 21, 2018Notice of Service
Date: Oct 25, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Oct 22, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Oct 22, 2018Notice
Date: Sep 24, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: Sep 17, 2018Notice
Date: Sep 12, 2018Motion for Default
Date: Sep 12, 2018Non-Military Affidavit
Date: Sep 10, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Sep 04, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Sep 04, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: Aug 23, 2018Notice of Service
Date: Aug 09, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Aug 01, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Aug 01, 2018Notice
Date: Jul 23, 2018Notice
Date: Jul 02, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: May 30, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: May 30, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: May 30, 2018Order Granting Motion
Date: May 30, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: May 12, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: Apr 25, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: Apr 25, 2018Order Granting Motion
Date: Apr 11, 2018Motion to Correct Scriveners Error
Date: Apr 04, 2018Notice of Service
Date: Mar 23, 2018Agreed Order
Date: Mar 19, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: Mar 15, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Mar 08, 2018Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic
Date: Feb 28, 2018Default
Date: Feb 28, 2018Motion for Default
Date: Feb 28, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Feb 18, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Feb 18, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: Feb 12, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Feb 12, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Feb 12, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: Feb 12, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Feb 12, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Feb 12, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 24, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: Jan 24, 2018Value Claim Form
Date: Jan 24, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 24, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 24, 2018Lis Pendens
Date: Jan 24, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title & Certificate of Disbursement Mailed | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursements | |
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale & Proof of Publication Mailed | |
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet | |
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale | |
February 04, 2020 | hearing | Foreclosure Sale | |
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication FEBRUARY 4, 2020 SALE DATE |
|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney February 4, 2020 at 10:00 AM EST |
|
December 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE CREATED FOR ORIGINAL DOCS |
|
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Costs | |
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Attorney Fees | |
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing | |
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion TO CONFORM THE PLEADINGS TO THE EVIDENCE BASED UPON STIPULATION FOR CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Original Mortgage |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Attorney Fees AND COSTS |
|
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Witness List Party: Plaintiff HSBC Bank USA National Association |
|
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Exhibit List | |
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Witness List | |
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting NON-JURY FORECLOSURE TRIAL AND PRETRIAL PROCEDURES |
|
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Setting | |
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Continuance TRIAL |
|
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Witness List PLAINTIFF'SParty: Plaintiff HSBC Bank USA National Association |
|
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference rm 15160 08-12-2019 1:30 PM |
|
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 08-12-2019 1:30 PM |
|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
June 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS, AND AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY'S FEESParty: Plaintiff HSBC Bank USA National Association |
|
June 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Attorney Fees AND COSTS |
|
June 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Affidavit in Support AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES |
|
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Affidavit | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal Party: Plaintiff HSBC Bank USA National Association |
|
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Final Judgment OF FORECLOSURE AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAWParty: Plaintiff HSBC Bank USA National Association |
|
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Witness List | |
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Exhibit List | |
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
May 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Substitution of Party(S) PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAINTIFF/ PLAINTIFF MIDFIRST BANK/ PLAINTIFF MIDFIRST BANK/ TTORNEY SPENCER GOLLAHON FBN: 64799 |
|
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting 08-27-2019 @ 9:00 AM |
|
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 06-25-2019 @ 1:30 PM |
|
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference | |
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Setting | |
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Production of Documents | |
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice OF SERVING ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCEParty: Plaintiff HSBC Bank USA National Association |
|
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 5-6-2019 1:30 PM room 15160 |
|
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 05-06-2019 1:30 PM - Room 15160 |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Reply to Affirmative Defenses Party: Plaintiff HSBC Bank USA National Association |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Cross Notice March 6, 2019 (AMENDED)Party: Defendant Northwest Savings Bank |
|
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Cross Notice CROSS-NOTICE ON ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCEParty: Defendant Northwest Savings Bank |
|
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
February 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Consolidate Party: Defendant Northwest Savings Bank |
|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Northwest Savings Bank |
|
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 03-06-2019 1:30 PM; ROOM 15160 |
|
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 03-06-2019 @ 1:30 PM |
|
January 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Zabrowski, Harold Defendant Frey, Heather |
|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Frey, Heather Defendant Zabrowski, Harold |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT/ PLAINTIFF MIDFIRST BANK/ ANA COHEN FBN: 46092 |
|
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
December 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 1-22-2019 1:30 PM room 14160 |
|
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE on JANUARY 22, 2019 @ 1:30 PM, RM 14160 |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Denying Motion to Dismiss | |
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 01/22/19 at 01:30 pm rm 14160 |
|
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 12-05-2018 8:45 AM; ROOM 14160 |
|
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 12-05-2018 8:45 AM |
|
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT HAROLD ZABROWSKI A/K/A HAOLD T. ZABROWSKI AND HEATHER FREY A/K/A HEATHER A. FREYParty: Plaintiff HSBC Bank USA National Association |
|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Party: Defendant Zabrowski, Harold Defendant Frey, Heather |
|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice OF SERVING ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR OCTOBER 22, 2018 @ 8:45 A.M.Party: Plaintiff HSBC Bank USA National Association |
|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default by the Court against Defendants, Harold Zabrowski A/K/A Harold T. Zabrowski and Heather Frey aka Heaher A. FreyParty: Plaintiff HSBC Bank USA National Association |
|
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Non-Military Affidavit | |
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 10-22-2018 8:45 AM; ROOM 14160 |
|
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 10-22-2018 8:45 AM |
|
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint VERIFIEDParty: Plaintiff HSBC Bank USA National Association |
|
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 09/04/18 at 01:30 pm rm 14160 |
|
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference | |
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR AUGUST 1st, 2018 AT 8:45 A.MParty: Plaintiff HSBC Bank USA National Association | |
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice CHANGE OF ATTORNEYParty: Plaintiff HSBC Bank USA National Association |
|
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference | |
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 08-01-2018 8:45 AM; ROOM 14160 |
|
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 8/1/18 8:45 AM RM 14160 |
|
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion Order on Deft's Motion to Dismiss Complaint is Granted. 60 Days to Amend |
|
May 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Zabrowski, Harold Defendant Frey, Heather |
|
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Frey, Heather Defendant Zabrowski, Harold |
|
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion TO CORRECT PLAINTIFF NAME DUE TO SCRIVENER'S ERROR |
|
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Correct Scriveners Error Party: Plaintiff Midfirst Bank |
|
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service Order AttchdParty: Plaintiff Midfirst Bank |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING /DEFT SHALL RESPONDBY 4/2/18 |
|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Default againstParty: Defendant Northwest Savings Bank Defendant Pembroke Falls Homeowners Association Inc |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Party: Plaintiff Midfirst Bank |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Default againstParty: Defendant Pembroke Falls Homeowners Association Inc Defendant Northwest Savings Bank |
|
February 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TIME TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADINGParty: Defendant Zabrowski, Harold Defendant Frey, Heather |
|
February 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance a/k/a Harold T. ZabrowskiParty: Defendant Zabrowski, Harold Defendant Frey, Heather |
|
February 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance a/k/a Harold T. ZabrowskiParty: Defendant Frey, Heather Defendant Zabrowski, Harold |
|
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved UNKNOWN TENANT 1 |
|
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 1/29/2018Party: Defendant Pembroke Falls Homeowners Association Inc |
|
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 1127/2018Party: Defendant Frey, Heather |
|
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved UNKNOWN TENANT 2 |
|
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 1/31/18Party: Defendant Northwest Savings Bank |
|
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 1/27/2018Party: Defendant Zabrowski, Harold |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance UNKNOWN TENANT 1Party: Plaintiff Midfirst Bank |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance UNKNOWN TENANT 2Party: Plaintiff Midfirst Bank |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance HAROLD ZABROWSKIParty: Plaintiff Midfirst Bank |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance HEATHER FREYParty: Plaintiff Midfirst Bank |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance NORTHWEST SAVINGS BANKParty: Plaintiff Midfirst Bank |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Value Claim Form | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance PEMBROKE FALLS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INCParty: Plaintiff Midfirst Bank |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint (eFiled) | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Lis Pendens Fld & Rec |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Defendant Count > than 5 Payor: JENNIFER TRAVIESO ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A011794; ;Amount: $2.50 |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: JENNIFER TRAVIESO ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A011794; ;Amount: $1,906.00 |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: JENNIFER TRAVIESO ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A011794; ;Amount: $10.00 |