Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Cassandra Lopez Plaintiff vs. EBHC LLC Defendant
On January 24, 2018 an appeal (county court) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Judge AP, Appeals presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 24, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 08, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Judge
Hon. Judge AP, Appeals
Category
Appeal (County Court)
Practice Area
Appeals
Matter Type
General Appeals
Status
Appealed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Returned Mail Undeliverable
Date: Jun 19, 2019Order to Show Cause
Date: Jun 05, 2019Acknowledgment
Date: Jan 29, 2018Pre-billed Appellant pending payment of:
Date: Jan 29, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 24, 2018Notice of Appeal
Date: Jan 24, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Undeliverable | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Appellant is DIRECTED to file a written response to show cause why this Court should not dismiss ths appeal, within THIRTY (30) days from the date ofthis Order. In the alternative, Appellant may ensre the transmission of the Record on |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgment Notice of Appeal |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Pre-billed Appellant pending payment of: | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | No Summons Issued | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICT10NParty: Plaintiff Lopez, Cassandra |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: CASSANDRA LOPEZ ; Userid: CTS-lwaters ; Receipt: 20181YE1M000114; omments: PD W/CASH ;Amount: $281.00 |