Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Douglas Branch Plaintiff vs. South Florida Lighting Team LLC, et al Defendant
On January 24, 2018 a neg - premises liability commercial case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Frink, Keathan B. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 24, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Neg - Premises Liability Commercial
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
General Commercial
Status
Closed
Overview
has thus made itself subject to the jurisdiction of this Court.
Causes of Action
COUNT I - NEGLIGENCE AGAINST DEFEND. TEAM, LLC
COUNT I - NEGLIGENCE AGAINST DEFENDANT CITY OF FORT LAUDERDALE
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a legal document filed by Douglas Branch against South Florida Lighting Team LLC and the City of Fort Lauderdale. The complaint alleges negligence and seeks damages of more than $15,000. The accident occurred on a public sidewal…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Notice of Cancellation
Date: Nov 05, 2018Notice of Compliance
Date: Oct 30, 2018Agreed Order
Date: Oct 30, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Oct 29, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: Oct 29, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: Oct 24, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Oct 24, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: Oct 23, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: Oct 17, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: Oct 16, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: Oct 10, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Oct 01, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: Sep 27, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: Sep 27, 2018Request for Production
Date: Sep 27, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Sep 20, 2018Amended Request to Produce
Date: Sep 19, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: Sep 19, 2018Request for Production
Date: Sep 19, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: Sep 17, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: Sep 17, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: Sep 17, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Sep 17, 2018Amended Answer to Amended Complaint
Date: Sep 17, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Sep 12, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Sep 12, 2018Privilege Log
Date: Sep 04, 2018Response to Request for Copies
Date: Sep 04, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: Sep 04, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Sep 04, 2018Amended Response to Request for Production
Date: Aug 30, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Aug 30, 2018Privilege Log
Date: Aug 30, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Aug 29, 2018Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses
Date: Aug 27, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: Aug 27, 2018Agreed Order
Date: Aug 15, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: Aug 14, 2018Request for Copies
Date: Aug 13, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: Aug 13, 2018Answer to Amended Complaint
Date: Aug 13, 2018Request for Production
Date: Aug 13, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Aug 09, 2018Answer to Amended Complaint
Date: Aug 07, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: Aug 06, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Jul 30, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: Jul 27, 2018Request for Production
Date: Jul 18, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: Jul 18, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: Jul 18, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: Jul 17, 2018eSummons Issuance - On Amended
Date: Jul 17, 2018Agreed Order
Date: Jul 17, 2018Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: Jul 16, 2018Amended Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Jul 10, 2018Not of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Under Rule 1.351
Date: Jul 06, 2018Request for Copies
Date: Jul 06, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: Jul 06, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Jun 22, 2018Agreed Order
Date: Jun 20, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: Jun 20, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Jun 04, 2018Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses
Date: May 31, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: May 30, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: May 18, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: May 15, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: May 15, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: May 14, 2018Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: May 14, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Apr 20, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: Apr 14, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: Apr 11, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Apr 06, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: Apr 06, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: Feb 13, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Feb 13, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: Jan 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 24, 2018Request for Production
Date: Jan 24, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 24, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 24, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Compliance | |
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order upon Plaintiff's Motion to Overrule Defendant |
|
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Plaintiff Douglas Branch's Motion To Overrule Defendant City Of Fort Lauderdale's Objections To Discvery and To Compel Better Answers To DiscoveryParty: Plaintiff Branch, Douglas |
|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Amended Request to Produce | |
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Reply to Affirmative Defenses | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Answer to Amended Complaint Party: Defendant City of Fort Lauderdale |
|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Privilege Log Party: Plaintiff Branch, Douglas |
|
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Copies Party: Plaintiff Branch, Douglas |
|
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Party: Plaintiff Branch, Douglas |
|
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories Party: Plaintiff Branch, Douglas |
|
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Amended Response to Request for Production | |
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Privilege Log | |
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses Party: Plaintiff Branch, Douglas |
|
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Reply to Affirmative Defenses Party: Plaintiff Branch, Douglas |
|
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses Party: Plaintiff Branch, Douglas |
|
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order on Pl's Mot to Overrule Df's Objections to Discovery |
|
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Amended Complaint Party: Defendant City of Fort Lauderdale |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant City of Fort Lauderdale |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Amended Complaint Party: Defendant South Florida Lighting Team LLC |
|
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 24th day of July, 2018Party: Defendant City of Fort Lauderdale |
|
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of No Objection | |
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions | |
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: COREY LEIFER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A097052; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint Party: Plaintiff Branch, Douglas |
|
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance - On Amended City of Fort Lauderdale |
|
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend the complaint |
|
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Leave to Amend THE COMPLAINTParty: Plaintiff Branch, Douglas |
|
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Answer & Affirmative Defenses AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL1Party: Defendant South Florida Lighting Team LLC |
|
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Not of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Under Rule 1.351 Party: Defendant South Florida Lighting Team LLC |
|
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
June 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order ON PLAINTIFF DOUGLAS BRANCH'S MOTION TO STRIKE SOUTH FLORIDA LIGHTING TEAM LLC'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSS TO THE COMPLAINT; GRANTED W/O PREJ |
|
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel BETTER ANSWERS TO DISCOVERYParty: Plaintiff Branch, Douglas |
|
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories | |
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses TO THE COMPLAINT BY DEF-SOUTH FLORIDA LIGHTING TEAM LLCParty: Plaintiff Branch, Douglas |
|
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time | |
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Reply to Affirmative Defenses | |
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Enlargement of Time TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REOUESTSParty: Defendant South Florida Lighting Team LLC |
|
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIALParty: Defendant South Florida Lighting Team LLC |
|
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
April 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability JULY 27, 2018 through AUGUST 7, 2018 |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses | |
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance PETER S. BAUMBERGER /FBN: 117803Party: Defendant South Florida Lighting Team LLC |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs TO SOUTH FLORIDA LIGHTING TEAM LLCParty: Plaintiff Branch, Douglas |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance SOUTH FLORIDA LIGHTING TEAM LLC |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production TO SOUTH FLORIDA LIGHTING TEAM LLCParty: Plaintiff Branch, Douglas |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Branch, Douglas |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: JONATHAN S BURNS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A011282; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: JONATHAN S BURNS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A011282; ;Amount: $401.00 |