Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Kelly Garcia Plaintiff vs. Jiin Fong Liou Defendant
On January 24, 2018 an auto negligence case was filed by Garcia, Kelly, represented by Harding, Tyler W, against Liou, Jiin Fong, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Haury, William W., Jr. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 24, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Auto Negligence
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Closed
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Circuit Court of the 17th Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The plaintiff, Kelly Garcia, is suing the defendant, Jiin Fong Liou, for damages in excess of $15,000. The complaint alleges th…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: May 14, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: May 14, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 24, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 24, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: TYLER W HARDING ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A068296; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Enlargement of Time Party: Plaintiff Garcia, Kelly |
|
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance JIIN FONG LIOU |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Garcia, Kelly |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: TYLER W HARDING ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A011281; ;Amount: $401.00 |