Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Marie Jean Baptiste Plaintiff vs. Wal-Mart Stores Inc Defendant
On January 17, 2018 a neg - premises liability commercial case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Perlman, Sandra presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 17, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Neg - Premises Liability Commercial
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
General Commercial
Status
Dismissal
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT 1 - NEGLIGENCE
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a personal injury claim filed by Marie Jean-Baptiste against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. The incident occurred on January 26, 2017, when Jean-Baptiste slipped and fell on an unsafe floor surface at a Wal-Mart store in Sunrise, Florida…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Stipulation
Date: Feb 10, 2020Amended
Date: Aug 02, 2019Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: Jul 10, 2019Stipulation Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: Jul 10, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: Jun 18, 2019Notice of Mediation
Date: Jun 12, 2019Certificate of Non-Appearance
Date: Apr 09, 2019Request for Copies
Date: Feb 25, 2019Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: Feb 18, 2019Certificate of No Objection
Date: Feb 11, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: Feb 05, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: Jan 31, 2019Notice for/of Trial
Date: Jan 17, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Jan 11, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Jan 07, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Nov 26, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Oct 16, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Oct 04, 2018Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: Oct 01, 2018Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: Sep 27, 2018Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: Sep 26, 2018Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: Sep 25, 2018Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: Sep 24, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: Sep 18, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: Sep 17, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Sep 11, 2018Objection
Date: Sep 06, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: Sep 05, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Aug 09, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: Jul 06, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: May 01, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: Apr 17, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Apr 13, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: Apr 13, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: Apr 03, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: Apr 03, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Apr 03, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Mar 23, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: Feb 19, 2018Reply
Date: Feb 19, 2018Notice of Filing Interrogs
Date: Feb 16, 2018Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Feb 16, 2018Notice
Date: Feb 16, 2018Request for Production
Date: Feb 16, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 17, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: Jan 17, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 17, 2018Request to Produce
Date: Jan 17, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation FOR FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Amended DEFENDANT WAL-MART STORES, INC.'S AMENDED CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITYParty: Defendant Wal-Mart Stores Inc |
|
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate OF AUTHOB!TYParty: Defendant Wal-Mart Stores Inc |
|
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order for Substitution of Counsel Gregory A. Victor, Esq., FBN 306371 - Cary C. Woods, II, Esq., FBN 28672Party: Defendant Wal-Mart Stores Inc |
|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE OF PROCESSParty: Defendant Wal-Mart Stores Inc |
|
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Non-Appearance | |
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
February 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served | |
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of No Objection | |
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice for/of Trial | |
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
November 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served | |
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served | |
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served | |
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served | |
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served | |
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served | |
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served | |
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served | |
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of No Objection | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of No Objection | |
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Objection TO DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY DATED SEPTEMBER 5, 2018Party: Plaintiff Jean Baptiste, Marie |
|
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions | |
April 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories | |
April 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request to Produce | |
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time | |
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Plaintiff Jean Baptiste, Marie |
|
February 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
February 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Reply TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSESParty: Plaintiff Jean Baptiste, Marie |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Interrogs Party: Defendant Wal-Mart Stores Inc |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Wal-Mart Stores Inc |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES IN COMPLIANCEParty: Defendant Wal-Mart Stores Inc |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Party: Defendant Wal-Mart Stores Inc |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Party: Defendant Wal-Mart Stores Inc |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: ABRAHAM OVADIA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A011709; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: ABRAHAM OVADIA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A007957; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: ABRAHAM OVADIA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A007957; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs To Wal-Mart Stores IncParty: Plaintiff Jean Baptiste, Marie |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Jean Baptiste, Marie |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request to Produce To Defendant Wal-Mart Stores IncParty: Plaintiff Jean Baptiste, Marie |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Not Issued - Atty advised Def name needs to match complaint |