Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
New Penn Financial LLC Plaintiff vs. Marla Cummings, et al Defendant
On January 17, 2018 a real prop homestead res fore - >$50k - <$250,000 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 17, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Real Prop Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Closed
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I ~MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by New Penn Financial, LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing against Marla Cummings and other defendants. The plaintiff is seeking equitable relief or damages in excess of $15,000 to foreclose a mort…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Final Disposition Form
Date: Jun 12, 2018Motion for Default Default
Date: Mar 15, 2018Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic
Date: Mar 15, 2018Affidavit
Date: Mar 15, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Mar 14, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Mar 13, 2018eSummons Issuance - Alias
Date: Feb 22, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: Feb 16, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: Feb 16, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Feb 16, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Feb 16, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Feb 16, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Feb 16, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: Feb 16, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Feb 16, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Feb 16, 2018Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Feb 14, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: Feb 14, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: Feb 12, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: Jan 30, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 17, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 17, 2018Value Claim Form
Date: Jan 17, 2018Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: Jan 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 17, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Form Dismissed Before Hearing |
|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default againstParty: Defendant Sosa, Luis Defendant Metzger Family Industries |
|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic Defendant(s), UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARLA CUMMINGS; UNKNOWN TENANT #1; UNKNOWN TENANT #2,Party: Plaintiff New Penn Financial LLC |
|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit OF MILITARY STATUS BASED UPON SERVICE RETURN |
|
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Green Corridor Property Assessment Clean Energy |
|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 03/07/2018, on GREEN CORRIDOR PROPERTY ASSESSMENT CLEAN ENERGY (PACE) DISTRICT |
|
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance - Alias GREEN CORRIDOR PROPERTY ASSESSMENT CLEAN ENERGY (PACE) DISTRICT |
|
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: JASON MICHAEL VANSLETTE ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A027385; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved UNKNOWN TENANT #1 |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved UNKNOWN TENANT #2 |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 1/29/2018Party: Defendant Broward County |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 2/15/2018Party: Defendant Sosa, Luis |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 1/31/2018Party: Defendant Metzger Family Industries |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 24th day of January, 2018Party: Defendant Green Corridor Property Assessment Clean Energy |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARLA CUMMINGS |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 1/25/2018Party: Defendant Cummings, Marla |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 1/25/2018Party: Defendant Tamarac Lakes North Association Inc |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Tamarac Lakes North Association Inc |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses TIMOTHY M. MCFARLAND, ESQ |
|
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Letter ResponseParty: Defendant Cummings, Marla |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint Party: Defendant Broward County |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: JASON MICHAEL VANSLETTE ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A007917; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: JASON MICHAEL VANSLETTE ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A007917; ;Amount: $906.00 |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Defendant Count > than 5 Payor: JASON MICHAEL VANSLETTE ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A007917; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) VERIFIEDParty: Plaintiff New Penn Financial LLC |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance UNKNOWN TENANT 2 |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance UNKNOWN TENANT 1 |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance METZGER FAMILY INDUSTRIES, INC |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance MARLA CUMMINGS |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance GREEN CORRIDOR PROPERTY ASSESSMENT CLEAN ENERGY (PACE) DISTRICT |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Value Claim Form Party: Plaintiff New Penn Financial LLC |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Lis Pendens | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance TAMARAC LAKES NORTH ASSOCIATION, INC |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARLA CUMMINGS |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance LUIS SOSA |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance BROWARD COUNTY |