Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Scott McGlynn, et al Plaintiff vs. Homeowners Choice Property and Casualty Ins Co Inc Defendant
On January 17, 2018 contract and indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 17, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Contract and Indebtedness
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Settlement
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Scott McGlynn and Shirley McGlynn against Homeowners Choice Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Inc. The plaintiffs allege breach of contract by the defendant. The plaintiffs state that they had an insurance policy…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Notice of Settlement
Date: Feb 21, 2019Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: Dec 18, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Feb 13, 2018Answer to Request for Admissions
Date: Feb 13, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: Feb 13, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Feb 13, 2018Request for Production
Date: Jan 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 17, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 17, 2018Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
Date: Jan 17, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: Jan 17, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 17, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff McGlynn, Scott |
|
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing | |
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Homeowners Choice Property and Casualty Ins Co Inc |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Request for Admissions Party: Defendant Homeowners Choice Property and Casualty Ins Co Inc |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Party: Defendant Homeowners Choice Property and Casualty Ins Co Inc |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Homeowners Choice Property and Casualty Ins Co Inc |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: ROGER A ALVAREZ ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A007915; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: ROGER A ALVAREZ ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A007915; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production FIRSTParty: Plaintiff McGlynn, Scott Plaintiff McGlynn, Shirley |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance HOMEOWNERS CHOICE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY INC |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Propounding Interrogatories Party: Plaintiff McGlynn, Scott Plaintiff McGlynn, Shirley |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Party: Plaintiff McGlynn, Scott Plaintiff McGlynn, Shirley |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) FOR BREACH OF CONTRACTParty: Plaintiff McGlynn, Scott Plaintiff McGlynn, Shirley |