Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Amanda L Davis Plaintiff vs. Arun C Perumpral Defendant
On January 17, 2018 an auto negligence case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 17, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Auto Negligence
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Dismissal
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Amanda L. Davis against Arun C. Perumpral, Sajan Kallupalathinkal, and Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The complaint alleges damages in excess of $15,000 resulting from a motor vehicle accident that occu…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Stipulation for Dismissal
Date: Aug 30, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: Jul 23, 2018Request for Copies
Date: Jul 19, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: Jul 18, 2018Notice of Interrogatories
Date: Jul 18, 2018Request to Produce
Date: Jul 18, 2018Request for Copies
Date: Jul 05, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: Jul 03, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Jun 29, 2018Notice of Compliance
Date: Jun 29, 2018Request for Copies
Date: Jun 22, 2018Notice of Filing Interrogs
Date: Jun 20, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: Jun 05, 2018Order on Motion to Compel
Date: May 30, 2018Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: May 15, 2018Request for Copies
Date: May 04, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: Apr 27, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: Apr 19, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Mar 27, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: Mar 20, 2018Notice of Disclosure
Date: Mar 20, 2018Answer
Date: Mar 20, 2018Answer
Date: Mar 20, 2018Notice
Date: Mar 20, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: Mar 05, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: Feb 20, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Feb 20, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: Feb 20, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: Feb 20, 2018Request for Production
Date: Feb 20, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 17, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 17, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 17, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE |
|
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Party: Plaintiff Davis, Amanda L |
|
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatories Party: Plaintiff Davis, Amanda L |
|
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request to Produce Party: Plaintiff Davis, Amanda L |
|
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatories Party: Plaintiff Davis, Amanda L |
|
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Party: Plaintiff Davis, Amanda L |
|
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request to Produce Party: Plaintiff Davis, Amanda L |
|
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
July 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Perumpral, Arun C Defendant Kallupalathinkal, Sajan Defendant Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Compliance AMENDED WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSESParty: Defendant Perumpral, Arun C Defendant Kallupalathinkal, Sajan Defendant Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Compliance AMENDED WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSESParty: Defendant Kallupalathinkal, Sajan Defendant Perumpral, Arun C Defendant Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company Defendant Perumpral, Arun C Defendant Kallupalathinkal, Sajan |
|
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Interrogs | |
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Interrogs | |
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order on Motion to Compel PLAINTIFF TO ANSWER REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS/INTERROGATORIES |
|
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Discovery Party: Defendant Perumpral, Arun C Defendant Kallupalathinkal, Sajan |
|
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERYParty: Plaintiff Davis, Amanda L |
|
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Party: Defendant Kallupalathinkal, Sajan |
|
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Disclosure Party: Defendant Kallupalathinkal, Sajan |
|
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer Party: Defendant Kallupalathinkal, Sajan |
|
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer Party: Defendant Perumpral, Arun C |
|
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Party: Defendant Perumpral, Arun C |
|
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs Party: Defendant Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Party: Defendant Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint Party: Defendant Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Party: Defendant Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: JOSE A. FUENTES ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A007955; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: JOSE A. FUENTES ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A007955; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance ISSUED ON: ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance ISSUED ON: SAJAN KALLUPALATHINKAL |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance ISSUED ON: ARUN C. PERUMPRAL |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Davis, Amanda L |