Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Express Revenue Inc Plaintiff vs. Konvergence Care LLC, et al Defendant
On January 17, 2018 contract and indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Bowman, John B. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 17, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Contract and Indebtedness
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Default Judgment
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I - BREACH OF WRITTEN AGREEMENT (Against Konvergence and Musonda)
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint was filed by Express Revenue, Inc. against Konvergence Care, LLC and Kwame Musonda. Express Revenue is a Florida corporation that operates a performance-based affiliate marketing network. Konvergence Care is a Delaware limited liab…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Satisfaction of Judgment in Garnishment
Date: Jun 15, 2018Final Judgment in Garnishment
Date: Jun 07, 2018Motion for Judgment in Garnishment
Date: May 18, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: May 18, 2018Notice to Defendant of Right Against Garnishment
Date: Apr 27, 2018Notice of Garnishment
Date: Apr 26, 2018Answer of Garnishee
Date: Apr 26, 2018eWrit Issuance - Garnishment
Date: Apr 06, 2018Motion for Garnishment After Judgment
Date: Apr 06, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Mar 20, 2018Supplemental
Date: Mar 19, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Feb 28, 2018Motion for Final Judgment of Default
Date: Feb 27, 2018Order
Date: Feb 27, 2018Motion for Default
Date: Feb 13, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Feb 13, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Feb 02, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 18, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 18, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 17, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 17, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment in Garnishment | |
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Final Judgment in Garnishment | |
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Judgment in Garnishment Party: Plaintiff Express Revenue Inc |
|
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice to Defendant of Right Against Garnishment Party: Plaintiff Express Revenue Inc |
|
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Garnishment | |
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer of Garnishee Garnishee JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A |
|
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ Fee Payor: AARON S BLYNN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A050854; ;Amount: $85.00 |
|
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
eWrit Issuance - Garnishment Garnishee: JP Morgan Chase & Co./ Def: Konvergence Care LLC/ $ 21,330.00 |
|
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Garnishment After Judgment Garnishee: JP Morgan Chase & Co./ Def: Konvergence Care LLC/ $ 21,330.00Party: Plaintiff Express Revenue Inc |
|
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Supplemental MOTION FOR FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT KONVERGENCE CARE, LLCParty: Plaintiff Express Revenue Inc |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Final Judgment of Default Party: Plaintiff Express Revenue Inc |
|
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR COURT'S DEFAULT GRANTED AGAINST KONVERGENCE CARE, LLC | |
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default COURT'S DEFAULTParty: Plaintiff Express Revenue Inc |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 1/22/18Party: Defendant Konvergence Care LLC |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Konvergence Care, LLC |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: AARON S BLYNN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A008198; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Kwame Musonda |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Express Revenue Inc |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: AARON S BLYNN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A007856; ;Amount: $401.00 |