Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Petrona Benett Beckett Plaintiff vs. Dusan Urosevic, et al Defendant
On January 17, 2018 an auto negligence case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Frink, Keathan B. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 17, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Auto Negligence
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Bankruptcy
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Circuit Court of the 17th Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The plaintiff, Petrona Benett Beckett, is suing the defendants, Dusan Urosevic and Joyce Di Maggio, for damages in excess of $1…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Stipulation
Date: Dec 17, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: Nov 29, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: Nov 08, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Nov 08, 2018Request for Copies
Date: Nov 05, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: Nov 02, 2018Request for Copies
Date: Oct 23, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: Oct 22, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: Oct 01, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: Sep 25, 2018Notice of Change of Address
Date: Sep 25, 2018Notice of Compliance
Date: Sep 14, 2018Request for Copies
Date: Sep 14, 2018Notice of Compliance
Date: Sep 12, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: Sep 12, 2018Certificate
Date: Sep 11, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: Sep 11, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: Sep 06, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Sep 05, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: Aug 31, 2018Request for Copies
Date: Aug 27, 2018Request for Medical Examination
Date: Aug 16, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: Aug 13, 2018Request for Production of Documents
Date: Aug 07, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: Aug 01, 2018Request for Copies
Date: Jul 30, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: Jul 23, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: Jul 20, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: Jul 05, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: Jun 26, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: Jun 25, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Jun 11, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: Jun 11, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Jun 11, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Jun 11, 2018Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: Jun 11, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Jun 07, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: Jun 07, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: Jun 06, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: Jun 04, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: May 29, 2018Cross Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 24, 2018Request for Copies
Date: May 24, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: May 21, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 18, 2018Certificate
Date: May 18, 2018Request for Examination
Date: May 17, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: May 17, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 10, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: May 09, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 03, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: Apr 30, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: Apr 30, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: Apr 30, 2018Certificate
Date: Apr 30, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: Apr 04, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Apr 04, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: Apr 04, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Mar 08, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: Mar 05, 2018Request for Production
Date: Mar 05, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Feb 23, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: Feb 20, 2018Interrogatories Notice of Filing
Date: Feb 15, 2018Request to Produce
Date: Feb 15, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: Feb 15, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: Feb 15, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: Feb 12, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: Feb 12, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Feb 12, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Feb 08, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Jan 30, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 17, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 17, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 17, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation OF DIMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT |
|
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
November 08, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL PAYMENT OF DISRUPTION FEEParty: Defendant Di Maggio, Joyce | |
November 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability MARC S. BUSCHMAN, ESQ |
|
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address | |
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Compliance | |
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Compliance | |
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of No Objection | |
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of No Objection | |
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate /STATEMENT OF ASSURANCE FOR SUBPOENAS INDIVIDUAL NOTIFICATION FOR SUBPOENA OF PROTECTED HEALTH INFRMATIONParty: Defendant Di Maggio, Joyce |
|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Production From Non-Party Party: Defendant Di Maggio, Joyce |
|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel TO PROVIDE VERIFIED ANSWERSParty: Defendant Urosevic, Dusan |
|
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Medical Examination SECOND REQUEST FOR MEDICAL EXAMINATION - October 8, 2018 at 3:00 pm |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production of Documents Party: Defendant Urosevic, Dusan |
|
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of No Objection | |
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of No Objection | |
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition 09/04/2018, BILLING CUSTODIAN AT BROWARD HEALTH |
|
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition 09/06/2018, BILLING CUSTODIAN AVENTURA WELLNESS |
|
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition 09/04/2018, HARRY A. COOPER D.O. |
|
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351) Party: Defendant Urosevic, Dusan |
|
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351) Party: Defendant Urosevic, Dusan |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Urosevic, Dusan |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses | |
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of No Objection | |
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of No Objection | |
May 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Cross Notice of Taking Deposition | |
May 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of No Objection | |
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Production From Non-Party Party: Defendant Di Maggio, Joyce |
|
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate STATEMENT OF ASSURANCE FOR SUBPOENAS |
|
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Examination THE PLAINTIFF , June 18, 2018Party: Defendant Di Maggio, Joyce |
|
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of No Objection | |
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing OF SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AND AUTOMATIC STAY OF PROCEEDINGSParty: Defendant Urosevic, Dusan |
|
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Production From Non-Party Party: Defendant Di Maggio, Joyce |
|
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate Party: Defendant Di Maggio, Joyce |
|
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories | |
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Party: Defendant Urosevic, Dusan |
|
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories | |
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs Party: Defendant Urosevic, Dusan |
|
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Party: Defendant Urosevic, Dusan |
|
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Interrogatories & Notice of Filing INTERROGATORIESParty: Plaintiff Beckett, Petrona Benett |
|
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request to Produce Party: Defendant Di Maggio, Joyce |
|
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Party: Defendant Di Maggio, Joyce |
|
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint Party: Defendant Di Maggio, Joyce |
|
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint Party: Defendant Urosevic, Dusan |
|
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Party: Defendant Urosevic, Dusan |
|
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Urosevic, Dusan |
|
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 3rd day of February, 2018Party: Defendant Urosevic, Dusan |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 25th day of January, 2018Party: Defendant Di Maggio, Joyce |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Joyce Marie Di Maggio |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Dusan Urosevic |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Beckett, Petrona Benett |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: EVAN M FELDMAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A007444; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: EVAN M FELDMAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A007444; ;Amount: $10.00 |