Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association Plaintiff vs. Ancel G Latty, et al Defendant
On January 16, 2018 a real prop homestead res fore - $0 - $50,000 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 16, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Real Prop Homestead Res Fore - $0 - $50,000
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Closed
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association against Ancel G. Latty and Hyacinth Latty in the Circuit Court of the Seventeenth Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The plaintiff alleges that An…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Notice of Cancellation
Date: Aug 10, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Jul 30, 2018Final Disposition Form
Date: Feb 20, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: Feb 20, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: Feb 15, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: Feb 15, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: Feb 15, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: Feb 15, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 16, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: Jan 16, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 16, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 16, 2018Value Claim Form
Date: Jan 16, 2018Lis Pendens
Date: Jan 16, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Form Dismissed Before Hearing |
|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss and Discharge Lis Pendens |
|
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved Unknown Parties in Possession #2 |
|
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved Party: Defendant Latty, Hyacinth |
|
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved Unknown Parties in Possession #1 |
|
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved Party: Defendant Latty, Ancel G |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: BARRY FISHMAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A007249; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: BARRY FISHMAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A007249; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Unknown Parties in possession #2 |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Unknown Parties In possession #1 |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Hyacinth Latty |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Ancel G Latty a/k/a Ancel Latty |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Edward J McDonough EsqParty: Plaintiff JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Verified o Foreclosure Home Equity MortgageParty: Plaintiff JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Value Claim Form Party: Plaintiff JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Lis Pendens Fld & Rec |