Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Trophies by Edco Inc Plaintiff vs. KRL Securities Holdings LLC Defendant
On January 16, 2018 an other - intellectual property case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Perlman, Sandra presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 16, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Other - Intellectual Property
Practice Area
Intellectual Property
Matter Type
General IP
Status
Dismissal
Overview
Name Act § 895.09 of the Florida Statutes, seeking cancellation of Florida registered
fictitious name and permanent injunctive relief, profits, damages, and attorneys’ fees in
connection with Defendant’s willful and fraudulent fictitious name registration of
Plaintiff Edco’s trade name, in violation of Florida statutes and Plaintiff's common law
trademark rights.
PARTIES
Plaintiff Edco is a corporation organized and existing under the laws of the State of
Florida, with its principal place of business in Broward County, Florida.
Plaintiff Edco has been conducting business in the State of Florida under the fictitious
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Trophies by EDCO, Inc. against KRL Securities Holdings, LLC. The complaint is for fictitious name cancellation under the Florida Fictitious Name Act. Trophies by EDCO alleges that KRL Securities Holdings fraudulently re…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Directions to the Clerk
Date: Apr 30, 2018Stipulation
Date: Apr 20, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Feb 12, 2018Affidavit of Service
Date: Jan 29, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 17, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 16, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 16, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Directions to the Clerk | |
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
|
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant KRL Securities Holdings LLC |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service 23rd day of January, 2018Party: Defendant KRL Securities Holdings LLC |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance KRL SECURITIES HOLDINGS, LLC |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: MIRIAM RICHTER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A007836; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: MIRIAM RICHTER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A007151; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) FOR FICTITIOUS NAME CANCELLATIONParty: Plaintiff Trophies by Edco Inc |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet |