Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Daniel Nogueira Plaintiff vs. Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company Defendant
On January 16, 2018 contract and indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 16, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Contract and Indebtedness
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Settlement
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT II DECLARATORY JUDGMENT
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Daniel Nogueira against Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company. The complaint alleges that there was a homeowners insurance policy in effect, with a policy number of 1501-1504-7486, and that the insured prope…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Motion to Enforce
Date: Jun 28, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Jun 28, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Feb 14, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: Feb 14, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Jan 26, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 16, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 16, 2018Interrogatories
Date: Jan 16, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 16, 2018Request for Production
Date: Jan 16, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Enforce SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND FOR SANCTIONSParty: Plaintiff Nogueira, Daniel |
|
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance /AMENDEDParty: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Party: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance TODD E. BRANT, ESQ.Party: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: ANTHONY M LOPEZ ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A007145; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: ANTHONY M LOPEZ ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A007145; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance ISSUED ON: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Nogueira, Daniel |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Interrogatories PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIESParty: Plaintiff Nogueira, Daniel |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTSParty: Plaintiff Nogueira, Daniel |