Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
United Marketing Group LLC, et al Plaintiff vs. Legal Club Financial Corporation, et al Defendant
On January 16, 2018 contract and indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Singer, Michele Towbin presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 16, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Contract and Indebtedness
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Closed
Overview
1 This is an action seeking damages for breach of contract, fraudulent
misrepresentation, and for an accounting,
The Parties
Plaintiff, UNITED MARKETING GROUP, LLC (“Plaintiff’ or “UMG”), is a
corporation duly formed under the laws of the State of Hlinois, with its principal address in
Oakbrook Terrace, Illinois.
Defendant, LEGAL CLUB FINANCIAL CORPORATION, (“Defendant” or
“LEGAL CLUB”), upon information and belief, is a corporation duly formed under the laws of
the State of Florida, with its principal place of business in Sunrise, Florida.
*** FILED: BROWARD COUNTY, FL BRENDA D. FORMAN, CLERK 1/16/2018 3:50:42 PM.****United Marketing Group, LLC v. Legal Club Financial Corp.
Complaint
Jurisdiction and Venue
4, The Court has jurisdiction over this dispute for the amount in controversy is in
excess of $15,000.00, exclusive of interest, costs and attorney’s fees.
Broward County, Florida is the appropriate venue for this action inasmuch as the
causes of action alleged herein accrued in whole or in part in Broward County, Florida.
This Court has personal jurisdiction over LEGAL CLUB inasmuch as it is
organized and existing under the laws of the State of Florida.
General Allegations
UMG operates membership programs which provide a variety of benefits,
including discounts on software, computer technical support, teleconferencing services, and a
teview and assessment of businesses e-mail systems, data security systems and network
infrastructure (the “Membership Programs”).
UMG enters into agreements with marketing partners who offer products and
services to the public, and when a consumer makes a purchase from the marketing partner, UMG
is authorized to promote, market, advertise, offer and/or sell its Membership Programs to
consumers.
Defendant, LEGAL CLUB, offers benefits to consumers including, legal, tax and
identity theft solutions. ,
Defendant had a contractual relationship with Discover Financial Services
(“Discover”) pursuant to which Defendant offered its various benefit programs to businesses
with Discover merchant accounts (“Merchant Accounts”), with the charges for the benefit
programs billed by Discover directly to the merchant accounts who enrolled (the “Discover
Contracts”).
Page 2 of 12United Marketing Group, LLC y. Legal Club Financial Corp.
Complaint
il. On or about October 1, 2006, UMG and Defendant entered into an Agreement
pursuant to which, LEGAL CLUB, upon the request of UMG, obtain from Discover and provide
to UMG merchant information for use by UMG in marketing its Membership Programs (the
“Agreement”). A true and correct copy of the Agreement is attached hereto as Exhibit “A.”
12, Pursuant to the Agreement, on a monthly basis, UMG shall provide Defendant an
electronic file identifying all Merchant Accounts who accepted, canceled or received a refund of
the Membership Programs. Defendant is required to then provide the information to Discover,
which would invoice and collect funds from the Merchant Accounts for the Membership
Programs.
The Agreement also provides that the funds collected by Discover in connection
with the Membership Programs, net of a refunds credited to the Merchant’s Account (the
“Gross Revenues”) are to be distributed as follows: Discover shall retain thirty percent (30%) of
the Gross Revenue, with the balance (the “Net Revenue”) to be provided to Defendant, and
LEGAL CLUB was required to forward the Net Revenue to UMG. Thereafter, UMG was
required to pay Defendant a commission equal to two and one-half percent (2.5%) of the Gross
Revenues on a monthly basis.
The Agreement permits UMG to arrange call centers to engage in outbound
telemarketing solicitations for the Membership Programs to the Merchant Accounts.
The Agreement also provides that the initial term of the Agreement is for two
years, with each party having a right to terminate the Agreement for any reason upon thirty (30)
days written notice to the other party.
Page 3 of 12United Marketing Group, LLC v. Legal Club Financial Corp.
Complaint
Pursuant to Section 5.4, “[nJotwithstanding any conflicting or inconsistent
provisions hereof, this Agreement shall terminate immediately upon the termination of the
Discover Contracts.”
17, Inasmuch as UMG did not have a direct contractual relationship with Discover,
Section 1.3 of the Agreement provides, inter alia, that LEGAL CLUB “shall promptly notify
UMG of any amendment, modification or other material change to the Discover Contracts.”
On or about March 1, 2008 (the “Effective Date”), UMG and the Defendant
entered into that certain Amended and Restated Agreement which amended and restated the
Agreement. A true and correct copy of the Amended Agreement is attached hereto as Exhibit
«B”
The Amended Agreement provides that the terms and provisions of the
Agreement shall remain in force and effect and apply to Merchant Accounts that enrolled prior to
the Effective Date (“Old Enrollments”) and all Merchant Accounts that enroll on or after the
Effective Date (“New Enrollments”) shall be subject to the terms and provisions of the Amended
Agreement.
The Amended Agreement, inier alia, provides that LEGAL CLUB assume the
responsibility for the outbound telemarketing for the Membership Program and also sets forth a
revised compensation arrangement for New Enrollments.
Specifically, Section 5 of the Amended Agreement provides that funds collected
by Discover in connection with New Enrollments, net of any refunds credited to the Merchant’s
Account are to be distributed as follows: Discover shall retain thirty percent (30%) of the Gross
Revenue, with the Net Revenue provided to Defendant, and LEGAL CLUB was required to
Page 4 of 12United Marketing Group, LLC v. Legal Club Financial Corp.
Complaint
forward the Net Revenue to UMG. Thereafter, UMG was required to pay Defendant a
commission equal to fifty percent (50%) of the Net Revenue.
Pursuant to Section 1.2 of the Amended Agreement, the parties agreed and
acknowledged that with respect to Old Enrollments, the compensation terms set forth under the
Agreement would remain in effect and shall survive the expiration or termination of the
Amended Agreement, so long as the Old Enrollments remained in the Membership Programs
and the Discover Contracts continue to be in effect.
Similar to Section 5.4 of the Agreement, Section 7.3 of the Amended Agreement
provides as follows:
Notwithstanding any conflicting or inconsistent provisions
hereof, this Amended and Restated Agreement shall terminate
immediately upon the termination of the Discover Contracts.
Legal Club shall immediately notify UMG in the event that the
Discover Contracts are terminated or that it receives a notice
of termination from Discover.
For approximately the first five (5) years after the Agreement was executed,
Discover retained its thirty percent (30%) of the Gross Revenue and distributed the Net Revenue
to the Defendant, which then distributed the Net Revenue to UMG, which then provided the
agreed upon compensation back to the Defendant and retained the balance.
In approximately 2011, LEGAL CLUB advised UMG that Discover no longer
desired to handle the fees collected in the same manner and instead UMG began to process the
payments through Automated Clearing House (“ACH”) transfers. UMG would then distribute to
Discover thirty percent (30%) of the Gross Revenue on all enrollments and distribute to LEGAL
CLUB fifty percent (50%) of the Net Revenue of New Enrollments and two and one-half percent
(2.5%) of the Gross Revenue on the Old Enrollments.
Page 5 of 12United Marketing Group, LLC y. Legal Club Financial Corp.
Complaint
26, Thereafter, in approximately the second quarter of 2013, LEGAL CLUB once
again advised UMG of a change in the payment arrangement and requested that UMG no longer
send Discover its payments directly, but advised that Discover requested its payments be sent to
LEGAL CLUB, which would then send payment to Discover.
Inasmuch as UMG did not have a direct contractual relationship with Discover,
communications between the parties went through LEGAL CLUB.
As requested, UMG began providing two monthly checks to LEGAL CLUB, one
for Discover, and the other for LEGAL CLUB and continued to do so.
In late 2017, UMG began seeking confirmation from LEGAL CLUB that they
had in fact been providing Discover with the payments that UMG had been sending LEGAL
CLUB for Discover,
LEGAL CLUB did not provide the requested confirmation, which prompted a
series of phone calls and e-mail correspondence between UMG and the Defendant, and finally
prompted UMG to offer to contact Discover directly to obtain the confirmation.
Finally, on January 9, 2018, Defendant sent an e-mail, which provided “[a]ttached
is the Termination Agreement we have with Discover. If you have any questions please let me
know.”
Attached to the aforementioned e-mail, was a purported letter from Pete Illian,
Vice President of Discover to William Case, Executive Vice President of Defendant, dated
September 16, 2013 (the “Termination Agreement”). A true and correct copy of the Termination
Agreement is attached hereto as Exhibit “C.”
Page 6 of 12United Marketing Group, LLC v. Legal Club Financial Corp.
Complaint
33, Upon receipt of the Termination Agreement, UMG was shocked to learn for the
first time that the Discover Contracts between Discover and LEGAL CLUB expired on May 31,
2013, and that Discover declined to renew the Discover Contracts.
The Termination Agreement provides that Discover would continue to receive its
thirty percent (30%) commission, but that as of January 1, 2014, Discover would discontinue
collection of its thirty percent (30%) commission.
LEGAL CLUB waiting more-than four (4) years before providing or notifying
UMG about the Termination Agreement, and only finally apprised UMG of the situation, after
UMG’s repeated requests for confirmation that the commissions to Discover were being sent by
Causes of Action
COUNT II FRAUDULENT MISREPRESENTATION
COUNT IIL ACCOUNTING
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by United Marketing Group, LLC (UMG) against Legal Club Financial Corporation (LEGAL CLUB). UMG alleges that LEGAL CLUB breached their contract, committed fraudulent misrepresentation, and failed to provide an accounting. …...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Notice of Mediation
Date: Jul 18, 2019Certificate
Date: Jul 16, 2019Notice of Mediation
Date: Jul 14, 2019Cross Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Jun 07, 2019Cross Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Jun 06, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 24, 2019Notice of Video Deposition
Date: May 16, 2019Order Denying Motion
Date: Mar 04, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: Jan 28, 2019Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: Jan 24, 2019Notice of Unavailability
Date: Jan 14, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Dec 10, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Nov 16, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Nov 06, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Oct 26, 2018Order Granting
Date: Oct 22, 2018Response
Date: Oct 18, 2018Letters of Rogatory
Date: Sep 28, 2018Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: Sep 26, 2018Amended Response to Request for Production
Date: Sep 26, 2018Motion to Compel Production
Date: Sep 24, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: Aug 30, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Aug 28, 2018Agreed Order Granting
Date: Aug 26, 2018Motion to Compel Production
Date: Aug 24, 2018Motion
Date: Aug 21, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Aug 21, 2018Amended Response to Request for Production
Date: Aug 20, 2018Answer to Counterclaim
Date: Jul 31, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Jul 20, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: Jul 20, 2018Amended
Date: Jul 13, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: Jun 12, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: Jun 08, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Jun 08, 2018Agreed Order
Date: May 27, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 02, 2018Notice of Service
Date: May 01, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: May 01, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: May 01, 2018Request for Production of Documents
Date: May 01, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: Apr 18, 2018Agreed Order
Date: Apr 17, 2018Agreed Motion
Date: Apr 16, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: Mar 13, 2018Agreed Order
Date: Mar 13, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: Mar 09, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: Mar 09, 2018Request for Production
Date: Mar 09, 2018Interrogatories
Date: Mar 09, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Mar 02, 2018Answer Affirmative Defenses Counterclaim
Date: Feb 28, 2018Motion
Date: Feb 28, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Jan 29, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 16, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 16, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 16, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
July 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate Of Authority:William Case, Carmen Tiritilli and Michael TiritilliParty: Defendant Legal Club Financial Corporation |
|
July 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
June 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Cross Notice of Taking Deposition June 24, 2019 at 10:30 a.m |
|
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Cross Notice of Taking Deposition Party: Defendant Legal Club Financial Corporation Defendant United Marketing Group, LLC |
|
May 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Video Deposition June 24, 2019 at 2:00 pm |
|
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion TO COMPEL |
|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Discovery Party: Defendant Legal Club Financial Corporation |
|
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Granting DEFENDANT/ COUNTER-PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF/ COUNTER-DEFENDANT TO PRODUCE DOCUENTS |
|
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT/COUNTER-PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED MOTION TO COMPELParty: Defendant United Marketing Group, LLC |
|
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letters of Rogatory TO THE CLERK OF COOK COUNTY, ILLINOIS TO ISSUE SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION |
|
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letters of Rogatory TO THE CLERK OF COOK COUNTY, ILLINOIS TO ISSUE SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION |
|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Amended Notice of Hearing | |
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Response to Request for Production Party: Defendant Legal Club Financial Corporation |
|
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Production AMENDEDParty: Defendant Legal Club Financial Corporation |
|
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order Granting GRANTING MOTION TO APPOINT COMMISSIONER AND F OR ISSUANCE OF LETTERS ROGATORY |
|
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Production Party: Defendant Legal Club Financial Corporation |
|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION TO APPOINT COMMISSIONER | |
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Response to Request for Production Party: Plaintiff United Marketing Group LLC |
|
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Counterclaim Party: Defendant United Marketing Group, LLC |
|
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories Party: Plaintiff United Marketing Group LLC |
|
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Party: Plaintiff United Marketing Group LLC |
|
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended COUNTERCLAIMParty: Defendant Legal Club Financial Corporation |
|
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
June 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions Party: Defendant Legal Club Financial Corporation |
|
June 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories Party: Defendant Legal Club Financial Corporation |
|
May 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order ON RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REOUESTS |
|
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service OF ITS FIRST INTERROGATORIESParty: Defendant Legal Club Financial Corporation |
|
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions FIRSTParty: Defendant Legal Club Financial Corporation |
|
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Request to Produce Party: Defendant Legal Club Financial Corporation |
|
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production of Documents Party: Defendant Legal Club Financial Corporation |
|
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time | |
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order ESTABLISHING PARAMETERS OF THE PARTIES' ACCOUNTINGS |
|
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Motion FOR ENTRY OF ORDER ADOPTING AND APPROVING STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENTParty: Defendant Legal Club Financial Corporation |
|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order ESTABLISHING RIGHTS TO ACCOUNTINGS, AND SEOUESTERING DISPUTED FUNDS WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Party: Plaintiff United Marketing Group LLC |
|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs Party: Plaintiff United Marketing Group LLC |
|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Party: Plaintiff United Marketing Group LLC |
|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Interrogatories Party: Plaintiff United Marketing Group LLC |
|
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Counter Pet-Cross Claim-3rd pty - Fee Paid Payor: ANTHONY J CARRIUOLO ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A031647; ;Amount: $395.00 |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer Affirmative Defenses & Counterclaim Party: Defendant Legal Club Financial Corporation |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion DEFENDANT LEGAL CLUBFOR ORDER ESTABLISHING THE PARTIES' RIGHTS TO ACCOUNTINGS AND SEOUESTERING DISPTED FUNDS PENDENTEUTEParty: Defendant Legal Club Financial Corporation |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 1/23/18Party: Defendant Legal Club Financial Corporation |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance To: LEGAL CLUB FINANCIAL CORP |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff United Marketing Group LLC |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: AVI M ZWELLING ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A007052; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: AVI M ZWELLING ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A007052; ;Amount: $401.00 |