Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
SFG Commercial Airport Leasing Inc Plaintiff vs. Winsor Brown, et al Defendant
On January 16, 2018 an other case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Fahnestock, Fabienne E. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 16, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT 1 - REPLEVIN
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by SFG Commercial Aircraft Leasing, Inc. ("SFG") against Winsor Brown and Paradise Airways Corp. ("PAC"). SFG is an Indiana corporation that does business in Florida. Brown is an individual residing in Broward County, Flor…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Final Disposition Form
Date: May 22, 2018Stipulation for Dismissal
Date: Apr 06, 2018Order Granting Motion
Date: Mar 06, 2018Motion for Continuance
Date: Mar 05, 2018Order to Show Cause
Date: Feb 12, 2018Motion for Order to Show Cause
Date: Feb 02, 2018Break Order
Date: Jan 31, 2018Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: Jan 30, 2018Ex Parte Motion
Date: Jan 29, 2018Order/Issuance of Pre-Judgment Writ of Replevin
Date: Jan 17, 2018Surety Bond
Date: Jan 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 16, 2018Motion for Pre-Judgment Writ of Replevin
Date: Jan 16, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 16, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 16, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Bond Discharged to plaintiff's attorney per order date 4/06/18; Wester Surety Co./$392,500.00/; Replevin Bond; Atty ictoria Jean Wilson P/U |
|
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Dismissal | |
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion CONTINUING HEARING, GRANTED / 03-06-18 9:15 AM, RM 14170 |
|
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance Party: Plaintiff SFG Commercial Airport Leasing Inc |
|
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Order to Show Cause Party: Plaintiff SFG Commercial Airport Leasing Inc |
|
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Break Order | |
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Affidavit | |
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Motion FOR BREAK ORDERParty: Plaintiff SFG Commercial Airport Leasing Inc |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order/Issuance of Pre-Judgment Writ of Replevin AND DIRECTING CLERK TO ACCEPT BONDS TO BE POSTED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Surety Bond of Replevin; Western Surety Co; $392,500.00 (attached) POA; Bond# 30032181 original in bond drawer |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Bond Approval Fee Payor: JEZABEL LIMA ; Userid: CTS-cmatthews ; Receipt: 20181YE1I000091; omments: MC ;Amount: $8.50 |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ Replevin Issued Per Order Dated 1-17-18. Writ Issued & HB TO ATTY |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ Fee Payor: JEZABEL LIMA ; Userid: CTS-njohnson ; Receipt: 20181YE1F000038; omments: WRIT OF REPLEVIN ;Amount: $85.00 |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance TO: Winsor Brown |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Pre-Judgment Writ of Replevin Party: Plaintiff SFG Commercial Airport Leasing Inc |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance TO: PARADISE AIRWAYS CORP |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) VERIFIED FOR REPLEVINParty: Plaintiff SFG Commercial Airport Leasing Inc |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: STUART I. GROSSMAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A006960; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: STUART I. GROSSMAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A006960; ;Amount: $10.00 |