Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Suntrust Bank Plaintiff vs. Veronica Vega Defendant
On January 16, 2018 contract and indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Singer, Michele Towbin presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 16, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Contract and Indebtedness
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Closed
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT Il- MONEY LENT
COUNT II - UNJUST ENRICHMENT
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by SunTrust Bank, doing business as LightStream, against Veronica Vega. The complaint alleges three counts: breach of agreement, money lent, and unjust enrichment. The damages sought in each count exceed $15,000, excluding…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Satisfaction
Date: May 09, 2019Subpoena Returned Unserved
Date: Feb 28, 2019Subpoena Returned Unserved
Date: Nov 06, 2018Affidavit of Costs
Date: Jul 13, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Jun 22, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: Jun 11, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: Apr 20, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Mar 31, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 16, 2018Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing
Date: Jan 16, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 16, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 16, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction Party: Plaintiff Suntrust Bank |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Subpoena Returned Unserved | |
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Returned Unserved Party: Defendant Vega, Veronica |
|
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Costs | |
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Party: Plaintiff Suntrust Bank |
|
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint Party: Defendant Vega, Veronica |
|
March 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 30th day of March, 2018Party: Defendant Vega, Veronica |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance VERONICA VEGAParty: Plaintiff Suntrust Bank |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing Party: Plaintiff Suntrust Bank |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Suntrust Bank |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: RALPH MARCADIS ESQUIRE ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A006863; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: RALPH MARCADIS ESQUIRE ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A006863; ;Amount: $10.00 |