Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Carlos H Cuevas Plaintiff vs. CleanNet of South Florida Defendant
On January 16, 2018 contract and indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Phillips, Carol-Lisa presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 16, 2018
Last Refreshed
October 05, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Judge
Hon. Phillips, Carol-Lisa
Category
Contract and Indebtedness
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Closed
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint was filed in the Circuit Court of the 17th Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The plaintiff, Caeros H. Cuevas, is seeking damages in the amount of $50,432. The plaintiff resides at an address in Broward County, Florida, w…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Order
Date: Mar 14, 2019Notice of Withdrawal
Date: Jan 09, 2019Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: Dec 19, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: Feb 16, 2018Complaint
Date: Feb 07, 2018Complaint
Date: Jan 16, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Lack of Prosecution and Notice of Hearing |
|
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal | |
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing | |
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Party: Defendant CleanNet of South Florida |
|
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint 1/30/18Party: Defendant CleanNet of South Florida |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint Party: Plaintiff Cuevas, Carlos H |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: CARLOS H CUEVAS ; Userid: CTS-acampos ; Receipt: 20181YE1Q000075; omments: VISA ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: CARLOS H CUEVAS ; Userid: CTS-acampos ; Receipt: 20181YE1Q000075; omments: VISA ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued hand back |