Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Donald Schlichtmann Plaintiff vs. Leon Nelson, et al Defendant
On January 16, 2018 contract and indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Bowman, John B. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 16, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Contract and Indebtedness
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Closed
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed in the Circuit Court of the 17th Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The plaintiff, Donald Schlichtmann, is suing the defendants, Leon Nelson and Patricia McEachin, for damages exceeding $15,000. The damages claim…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Order
Date: Feb 20, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: Feb 20, 2019Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: Dec 07, 2018Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: Dec 06, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Nov 28, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: Feb 09, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Jan 24, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Jan 24, 2018Complaint
Date: Jan 16, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 16, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Order | |
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Motion to Dismiss Party: Plaintiff Schlichtmann, Donald |
|
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Motion to Dismiss Party: Plaintiff Schlichtmann, Donald |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference | |
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 01/23/18Party: Defendant Mceachin, Patricia |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 01/23/18Party: Defendant Nelson, Leon |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Issued On Deft Patricia Mceachin/ HB TO PLNFT |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Issued On Deft Leon Nelson/ HB TO PLNFT |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint Party: Plaintiff Schlichtmann, Donald |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: DONALD SCHLICHTMANN ; Userid: CTS-njohnson ; Receipt: 20181YE1F000033; omments: CASH ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: DONALD SCHLICHTMANN ; Userid: CTS-njohnson ; Receipt: 20181YE1F000033; omments: CASH ;Amount: $20.00 |