Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Luis Dominicis Plaintiff vs. State Farm Florida Insurance Company Defendant
On January 12, 2018 an other - insurance claim case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Frink, Keathan B. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 12, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Other - Insurance Claim
Practice Area
Insurance
Matter Type
Insurance Coverage
Status
Summary Judgment
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I- DECLARATORY RELIEF
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Luis Dominicis against State Farm Florida Insurance Company. The plaintiff is the owner of a property located in Broward County, Florida, and the defendant is a homeowner's insurance company. The plaintiff alleges that …...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Notice of Hearing
Date: Jul 28, 2020Order Denying Motion
Date: Mar 12, 2020Agreed Order
Date: Mar 12, 2020Response to Motion
Date: Mar 03, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: Dec 17, 2019Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: Dec 10, 2019Affidavit
Date: Dec 10, 2019Affidavit in Support
Date: Dec 10, 2019Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: Dec 10, 2019Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: Nov 05, 2019Motion to Tax Costs
Date: Nov 05, 2019Order
Date: Nov 04, 2019Notice of Filing Deposition
Date: Oct 16, 2019Response to Motion for Judgment
Date: Oct 16, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: Oct 01, 2019Notice of Filing Deposition
Date: Oct 01, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: Oct 01, 2019Order
Date: Aug 28, 2019Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: Jul 10, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: Jul 09, 2019Response to Request to Produce
Date: Jun 26, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: Jun 06, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 28, 2019Request to Produce
Date: May 28, 2019Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: May 20, 2019Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: May 08, 2019Notice of Unavailability
Date: May 06, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 03, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: Apr 24, 2019Notice
Date: Apr 23, 2019Motion to Take Judicial Notice
Date: Apr 23, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Apr 03, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Mar 18, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: Feb 25, 2019Notice of Unavailability
Date: Feb 23, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: Jan 17, 2019Notice of Unavailability
Date: Dec 12, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: Jun 27, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 11, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: May 10, 2018Agreed Order
Date: May 10, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 10, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: May 10, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: May 10, 2018Agreed Order
Date: May 02, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: May 01, 2018Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: Apr 20, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Apr 12, 2018Reply to Answer
Date: Mar 28, 2018Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
Date: Mar 27, 2018Answer
Date: Mar 27, 2018Request to Produce
Date: Mar 27, 2018Privilege Log
Date: Mar 26, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: Mar 26, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Mar 26, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Feb 20, 2018Request for Production of Documents
Date: Feb 14, 2018Notice
Date: Feb 14, 2018Reservation of Rights to Trial By Jury
Date: Feb 14, 2018Motion
Date: Feb 14, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Feb 14, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: Feb 14, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 12, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 12, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 12, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion Entitlement to Attorneys' Fees |
|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order Defendant's Motion to Tax Costs |
|
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response to Motion PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENTITLEMENT TO ATTORNEY'S FEES UNDER FLORIDA STATUTE 57.105Party: Plaintiff Dominicis, Luis |
|
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF KELLY PHANParty: Defendant State Farm Florida Insurance Company |
|
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Affidavit OF KELLY PHAN |
|
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit in Support | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Affidavit OF KELLY PHAN/ DEF FEDERATED NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Attorney Fees Party: Defendant State Farm Florida Insurance Company |
|
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Tax Costs Party: Defendant State Farm Florida Insurance Company |
|
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT - GRANTED |
|
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Deposition | |
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Response to Motion for Judgment AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITIONParty: Plaintiff Dominicis, Luis |
|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Party: Plaintiff Dominicis, Luis |
|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Deposition Party: Plaintiff Dominicis, Luis |
|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order ON DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S 2ND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION/OVERRULED AS TO REQ #3. DEFT W/N 20 DAYS. |
|
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Amended Notice of Hearing | |
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Response to Request to Produce | |
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Request to Produce | |
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Attorney Fees DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENTITLEMENT TO ATTORNEY'S FEES UNDER FLORIDA STATUTE 57.105Party: Defendant State Farm Florida Insurance Company |
|
May 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Affidavit | |
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Party: Defendant State Farm Florida Insurance Company |
|
April 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD?Party: Defendant State Farm Florida Insurance Company |
|
April 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Take Judicial Notice Party: Defendant State Farm Florida Insurance Company |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
February 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories | |
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order ON DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORY NUMBER 4 /OVERRULED |
|
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY |
|
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Plaintiff Dominicis, Luis |
|
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Hearing | |
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Reply to Answer Party: Plaintiff Dominicis, Luis |
|
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Propounding Interrogatories Party: Defendant State Farm Florida Insurance Company |
|
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer Party: Defendant State Farm Florida Insurance Company |
|
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request to Produce Party: Defendant State Farm Florida Insurance Company |
|
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Privilege Log | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories | |
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINTParty: Defendant State Farm Florida Insurance Company |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Production of Documents | |
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESSParty: Defendant State Farm Florida Insurance Company |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Reservation of Rights to Trial By Jury Party: Defendant State Farm Florida Insurance Company |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR TRIAL BY JURYParty: Defendant State Farm Florida Insurance Company |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant State Farm Florida Insurance Company |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: MICHAEL D KAPLAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A006334; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: MICHAEL D KAPLAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A006334; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) FOR DECLARATORY RELIEFParty: Plaintiff Dominicis, Luis |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance State Farm Florida Insurance Company |