Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Bank of Ameica NA Plaintiff vs. Irma Shimoni Defendant
On January 12, 2018 contract and indebtedness case was filed by Bank Of Ameica Na, represented by Palma, Jorge L, Esq., against Shimoni, Irma, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Haury, William W., Jr. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 12, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Contract and Indebtedness
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Default Judgment
Overview
Causes of Action
1. - BREACH OF CONTRACT
2. - ACCOUNT STATED Plaintiff realleges paragraphs | - 9 as though fully stated herein.
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Bank of America, N.A. against Irma Shimoni. Bank of America alleges that Irma Shimoni applied for and received a credit account, which is owned and administered by the bank. However, Irma Shimoni breached the agreement …...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Affidavit of Costs
Date: Aug 21, 2018Motion for Default Final Judgment
Date: Aug 21, 2018Non-Military Affidavit
Date: Aug 21, 2018Affidavit
Date: Aug 21, 2018Order Granting Motion
Date: Jul 20, 2018Motion for Default Final Judgment
Date: Jul 18, 2018Non-Military Affidavit
Date: Jul 18, 2018Affidavit
Date: Jul 18, 2018Affidavit of Costs
Date: Jul 18, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Jul 17, 2018Motion to Appear Telephonically
Date: Jul 17, 2018Motion for Default Final Judgment
Date: Jul 10, 2018Affidavit of Costs
Date: Jul 10, 2018Non-Military Affidavit
Date: Jul 10, 2018Motion for Default
Date: Jun 18, 2018Default
Date: Jun 18, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Jan 23, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 12, 2018Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing
Date: Jan 12, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 12, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Costs Party: Plaintiff Bank of Ameica NA |
|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Final Judgment Party: Plaintiff Bank of Ameica NA |
|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Non-Military Affidavit SUPPLEMENTALParty: Plaintiff Bank of Ameica NA |
|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion For Telephonic Appearance |
|
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Final Judgment Party: Plaintiff Bank of Ameica NA |
|
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Non-Military Affidavit SUPPLEMENTAL NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT |
|
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Costs | |
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing on September 5th, 2018 at 8:45am |
|
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Appear Telephonically Party: Plaintiff Bank of Ameica NA |
|
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Final Judgment Party: Plaintiff Bank of Ameica NA |
|
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Costs | |
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Non-Military Affidavit SUPPLEMENTAL |
|
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Non-Military Affidavit SUPPLEMENTAL |
|
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Party: Plaintiff Bank of Ameica NA |
|
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Default againstParty: Defendant Shimoni, Irma |
|
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 1/23/18Party: Defendant Shimoni, Irma |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: JORGE L PALMA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A006175; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: JORGE L PALMA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A006175; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance IRMA SHIMONI |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) For DamagesParty: Plaintiff Bank of Ameica NA |