Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Collins Asset Group Llc Plaintiff vs. Jose Esquijarosa Defendant
On January 12, 2018 contract and indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Phillips, Carol-Lisa presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 12, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Judge
Hon. Phillips, Carol-Lisa
Category
Contract and Indebtedness
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Bankruptcy
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by COLLINS ASSET GROUP, LLC against JOSE ESQUIJAROSA in the Circuit Court of Broward County, Florida. The complaint alleges two counts of breach of a promissory note. The plaintiff, COLLINS ASSET GROUP, LLC, claims damages…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Suggestion of Bankruptcy
Date: Apr 30, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: Feb 01, 2018Answer
Date: Jan 29, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Jan 25, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 12, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 12, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 12, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Suggestion of Bankruptcy Bankruptcy Case No. 18-15066-RBRParty: Defendant Esquijarosa , Jose |
|
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions | |
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer DENYING ALLEGATIONS. RESERVING RIGHT TO ASSERT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FLE BANKRUPTCYParty: Defendant Esquijarosa , Jose |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 01/22/18 @ 7:20 PMParty: Defendant Esquijarosa , Jose |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Collins Asset Group Llc |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance JOSE ESQUIJAROSA |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: THOMAS L AVRUTIS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A006084; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: THOMAS L AVRUTIS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A006084; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet |