Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Department Stores National Bank Plaintiff vs. Teresa R Nicolicchia Defendant
On January 12, 2018 contract and indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 12, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 08, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Contract and Indebtedness
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: Jan 09, 2020Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel PIERO A. RODRIGUEZ, ESQ FBN 1004389Party: Defendant Nicolicchia, Teresa R |
|
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Determine Confidentiality of Court Records Party: Plaintiff Department Stores National Bank |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Non Confidential Notice to Party | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENTParty: Plaintiff Department Stores National Bank |
|
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Affidavit Supporting Summary Judgment |
|
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Amended PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION AND DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION FOR TRIAL |
|
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Request to Produce | |
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions | |
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
April 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint Party: Defendant Nicolicchia, Teresa R |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Nicolicchia, Teresa R |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Nicolicchia, Teresa R |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses JOSE LUIS LAGO ESQ |
|
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served on the 30th day of January, 2018Party: Defendant Nicolicchia, Teresa R |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Department Stores National Bank |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance TERESA R NICOLICCHIA |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: MICHAEL THIEL DEBSKI ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A006126; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: MICHAEL THIEL DEBSKI ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A006126; ;Amount: $401.00 |