Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
SMS Financial JDC LP Plaintiff vs. James Wazbinski, et al Defendant
On January 12, 2018 contract and indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 12, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Contract and Indebtedness
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Bankruptcy
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I - BREACH OF AGREEMENT - JAMES WAZBINSKI
COUNT II - BREACH OF AGREEMENT ~ ELIZABETH WAZBINSKI
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by SMS Financial JDC, L.P. against defendants James Wazbinski and Elizabeth Wazbinski. The complaint alleges breach of agreement by both defendants. James Wazbinski executed a Home Equity Line Agreement and Disclosure Stat…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Final Judgment in Garnishment
Date: Mar 11, 2019Motion for Garnishment After Judgment
Date: Feb 27, 2019Writ of Continuing Garn Returned Served
Date: Feb 06, 2019Answer of Garnishee
Date: Feb 01, 2019Notice of Garnishment to Defendant
Date: Jan 31, 2019Motion for Continuing Writ of Garnishment
Date: Jan 11, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: Mar 07, 2018Certificate of Service
Date: Mar 07, 2018Affidavit of Indebtedness
Date: Mar 07, 2018Affidavit of Attorney Fees
Date: Mar 07, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Feb 15, 2018Motion for Default Default
Date: Feb 15, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Feb 15, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 12, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 12, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 12, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 12, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Suggestion of Bankruptcy Case Number 20-19883Party: Defendant Wazbinski, Elizabeth |
|
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT |
|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certified & True Copy Issued MB to Atty |
|
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Final Judgment in Garnishment | |
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Garnishment After Judgment Party: Plaintiff SMS Financial JDC LP |
|
February 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Continuing Garn Returned Served | |
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Garnishment AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParty: Plaintiff SMS Financial JDC LP |
|
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Answer of Garnishee Garnishee School Board Of Broward County |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Garnishment to Defendant | |
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certified & True Copy Issued MB to Atty |
|
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Contin Writ Garn & Req Procedure Forms Garnishee School Board Of Broward County Amount $48,975.94 |
|
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ Fee Payor: RICHARD B STORFER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A007473; ;Amount: $85.00 |
|
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuing Writ of Garnishment Party: Plaintiff SMS Financial JDC LP |
|
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Affidavits of Richard B. Storfer and Jonathan HarrisParty: Plaintiff SMS Financial JDC LP |
|
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service copy of the attached DefaultParty: Plaintiff SMS Financial JDC LP |
|
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Indebtedness | |
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Attorney Fees | |
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 17th day of January, 2018Party: Defendant Wazbinski, Elizabeth |
|
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default againstParty: Defendant Wazbinski, James Defendant Wazbinski, Elizabeth |
|
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 17th day of January, 2018Party: Defendant Wazbinski, James |
|
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Non-Military Affidavit | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance JAMES WAZBINSKI |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance ELIZABETH WAZBINSKI |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff SMS Financial JDC LP |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: RICHARD B STORFER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A006105; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: RICHARD B STORFER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A006105; ;Amount: $401.00 |