Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Bob Van Hoof Plaintiff vs. Jessica Lallogia Defendant
On January 12, 2018 a real prop other - $0 - $50,000 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Lopane, Nicholas presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 12, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Real Prop Other - $0 - $50,000
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
General Property
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Notice of Cancellation
Date: Mar 23, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Feb 17, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Feb 05, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: Feb 05, 2018Non-Military Affidavit
Date: Feb 01, 2018Notice of Filing/Affidavit of Service Returned Served
Date: Jan 25, 2018Notice of Filing/Affidavit of Service Returned Unserved
Date: Jan 25, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 12, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 12, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 12, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 12, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
February 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Lallogia, Jessica |
|
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Party: Defendant Lallogia, Jessica |
|
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Non-Military Affidavit | |
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing/Affidavit of Service Returned Served 18th day of January, 2018Party: Defendant Lallogia, Jessica |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing/Affidavit of Service Returned Unserved JOHN DOE/UNKNOWN TENANT |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance John Doe/Unknown Tenant |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) for EjectmentParty: Plaintiff Van Hoof, Bob |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Jessica Lallogia |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: JEROME L TEPPS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A006120; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: JEROME L TEPPS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A006120; ;Amount: $401.00 |