Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Sam Green Plaintiff vs. Citizens Property Insurance Corporation Defendant
On January 12, 2018 contract and indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Perlman, Sandra presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 12, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 08, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Contract and Indebtedness
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Dismissal
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a response from the Defendant, Citizens Property Insurance Corporation, to a lawsuit filed by the Plaintiff, Sam Green. The Defendant admits to being a statutorily-created government entity that provides property insurance polic…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Stipulation for Dismissal
Date: Aug 29, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: Apr 11, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: Apr 03, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: Apr 03, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: Apr 03, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Apr 03, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: Mar 20, 2018Request to Produce
Date: Jan 12, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: Jan 12, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE |
|
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Joaquim Medeiros. October 30,2018 @ 1:00pm |
|
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition September 18,2018Party: Plaintiff Green, Sam |
|
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Joaquim Medeiros October 30,2018 c/o Rimkus Consulting Group, Inc. 1:00 pmParty: Plaintiff Green, Sam |
|
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Jessee Meade c/o Citizens Property Insurance Corporation 10/26/18 10:00 AMParty: Plaintiff Green, Sam |
|
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition DUCES TECUMParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Mediation June 15, 2018 @1:00PM |
|
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories | |
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance AND EMAIL ADDRESS DESIGNATIONParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Acceptance of Service Friday, January 26, 2018Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request to Produce TO DEFENDANT CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATIONParty: Plaintiff Green, Sam |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs TO DEFENDANT CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATIONParty: Plaintiff Green, Sam |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIALParty: Plaintiff Green, Sam |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses CLAYTON T. KUHNParty: Plaintiff Green, Sam |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions TO DEFENDANT CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATIONParty: Plaintiff Green, Sam |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: CLAYTON TYLER KUHN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A005922; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: CLAYTON TYLER KUHN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A005922; ;Amount: $401.00 |